Pierce v. Grinnell Select Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Stephanie Pierce
Defendant: Grinnell Select Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2020cv00144
Filed: June 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Stephen N Limbaugh
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2020 Filing 12 ENTRY of Appearance by Derrick S. Kirby for Plaintiff Stephanie Pierce. (Kirby, Derrick)
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: This case is before the Court for a Rule 16 hearing scheduled today via telephone conference call. Counsel for defendant appears, but counsel for plaintiff does not appear despite this Court's repeated attempts to contact counsel. The Court also notes that neither Matthew Edmundson, who has formally entered his appearance on behalf of plaintiff, nor Kyle Warren, who has not formally entered his appearance on behalf of plaintiff but who signed the proposed scheduling order, is admitted to practice before the United States District Court, Eastern District of Missouri. Accordingly, both attorneys Edmundson and Warren are disqualified from representing plaintiffs in this case unless and until they are formally admitted to practice in this Court. The case will be continued for 21 days to allow counsel to secure admission to practicebefore this Court or for plaintiff to obtain new counsel. This Court will also entertain a motion for sanctions by defendant for the delay. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 8/7/20. (Copy of order sent by regular mail to Kyle Warren at 201 N. Main Street, Popular Bluff, Missouri 63901 and by email to kyle@edmundsonlawfirm.com)(CSG)
July 29, 2020 Filing 10 JOINT SCHEDULING PLAN by Defendant Grinnell Select Insurance Company. . (Cooney, John)
July 21, 2020 Filing 9 ENTRY of Appearance by Patrick Connary Meyer for Defendant Grinnell Select Insurance Company. (Meyer, Patrick)
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 RULE 16 ORDER: Joint Scheduling Plan due by 7/30/2020. Rule 16 Conference set for 8/7/2020 11:00 AM by Telephone Conference in Chambers before District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh Jr. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 7/7/20. (CSG)
July 1, 2020 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by John D. Cooney for Defendant Grinnell Select Insurance Company. (Cooney, John)
July 1, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Grinnell Select Insurance Company Sent To: Plaintiff (CSG)
June 30, 2020 Filing 5 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court of Butler County, Missouri, filed by Stephanie Pierce.(CSG)
June 30, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) filed by Defendant Grinnell Select Insurance Company. (Cooney, John)
June 30, 2020 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Grinnell Select Insurance Company.. (Cooney, John)
June 30, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Grinnell Select Insurance Company Sent To: Plaintiff (Cooney, John)
June 30, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Butler County, Missouri, case number 20BT-CV01231, with receipt number AMOEDC-7993484, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Grinnell Select Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Original Filing Form)(Cooney, John)
June 30, 2020 Case Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh Jr. (CSG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pierce v. Grinnell Select Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grinnell Select Insurance Company
Represented By: John D. Cooney
Represented By: Patrick Connary Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Pierce
Represented By: Matthew S. Edmundson
Represented By: Derrick S. Kirby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?