Blankenship v. Saul
Plaintiff: Robert Joseph Blankenship, Jr.
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Interested Party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Case Number: 1:2020cv00170
Filed: August 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Stephen R Welby
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2020 Filing 7 FULL CONSENT has been received by Plaintiff Robert Joseph Blankenship, Jr, Defendant Andrew M. Saul. (MRS)
August 19, 2020 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Jane Rund for Defendant Andrew M. Saul. (Rund, Jane)
August 18, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed Defendant Andrew M. Saul served on 8/17/2020, answer due 10/16/2020. (MRS)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER This case is assigned to Track: 4, Administrative Notice re: Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction due by 9/8/2020. Pursuant to Rule 12(a)(3) and ( 4), Fed.R.Civ.P., Defendant must file any motion to dismiss,motion to remand, and/or answer within sixty (60) days of service of Plaintiffs complaint. Alongwith its answer Defendant shall file a transcript of the record, in accordance with 42 U.S.C. 405(g).. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen R. Welby on 8/14/20. (MRS)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall issue process or cause process to issueon the complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen R. Welby on 8/14/20. (MRS)
August 14, 2020 Summons Issued as to defendant Andrew M. Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. The summons was mailed to USM office- St. Louis. (MRS)
August 12, 2020 Filing 3 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW)
August 12, 2020 Case Opening Notification: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Judge Assigned: U.S. Magistrate Judge Stephen R. Welby. (MRS)
August 11, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Robert Joseph Blankenship, Jr. (Overton, Kathleen)
August 11, 2020 Filing 1 Social Security COMPLAINT Non-Jury Demand,Yes or No - Yes,, filed by Robert Joseph Blankenship, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Summons Atty General, #4 Summons ORC, #5 Summons US Atty)(Overton, Kathleen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blankenship v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Joseph Blankenship, Jr.
Represented By: Kathleen E. Overton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Represented By: Jane Rund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?