United States of America v. $51,940.00 U.S. Currency
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $51,940.00 U.S. Currency and Ali Nazih Alkhatib
Case Number: 1:2020cv00175
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Stephen N Limbaugh
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE by Defendant Ali Nazih Alkhatib re #10 MOTION to Dismiss Case For Failure to State A Claim for Which Relief May be Granted (Attachments: #1 Errata Notice of Errata Re: Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State A Claim for Which Relief May be Granted)(Salem, Edmond)
October 14, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Defendant Ali Nazih Alkhatib. (Salem, Edmond)
October 2, 2020 Filing 9 DECLARATION filed by Plaintiff United States of America of Public Notification. (McClure-Hartman, Lindsay)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Edmond E. Salem. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-8164356) by Defendant Ali Nazih Alkhatib. (Salem, Edmond) filed by Ali Nazih Alkhatib; MOTION ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 9/24/20. (CSG)
September 23, 2020 Filing 7 CLAIM Verified filed by Defendant Ali Nazih Alkhatib filed by Defendant Ali Nazih Alkhatib. (Salem, Edmond)
September 23, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Edmond E. Salem. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-8164356) by Defendant Ali Nazih Alkhatib. (Salem, Edmond)
September 4, 2020 Filing 5 MARSHAL Return Executed party served: Ziad Khalil Mohammad Dawas, Type of return Complaint & Notice, by certified mail. (CSG)
September 4, 2020 Filing 4 MARSHAL Return Executed party served: Ali Nazih Alkhatib, Type of return Complaint & Notice, by certified mail. (CSG)
August 24, 2020 Filing 3 MARSHAL Return Executed party served: $51,940.00 U.S. Currency, Type of return Complaint & Warrant. (CSG)
August 19, 2020 Case Opening Notification: Warrant Issued. Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh Jr. (CSG)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT of Forfeiture against defendant $51,940.00 U.S. Currency Non-Jury Demand,, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Warrant)(McClure-Hartman, Lindsay)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $51,940.00 U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $51,940.00 U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ali Nazih Alkhatib
Represented By: Edmond E. Salem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Lindsay L. McClure-Hartman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?