Walker v. Saul
Plaintiff: Timothy John Walker
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Interested Party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Case Number: 1:2020cv00259
Filed: December 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Noelle C Collins
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 5, 2021 Filing 9 FULL CONSENT has been received by Defendant Andrew M. Saul, Plaintiff Timothy John Walker. Consent to Magistrate Judge, Consent to Magistrate Judge (CMH)
January 4, 2021 Notice from Clerk instructing Plaintiff Timothy John Walker to submit Notice regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Notice re: Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction due by 1/11/2021. (CMH)
December 31, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Timothy John Walker. Defendant Andrew M. Saul served on 12/28/2020. (CMH)
December 30, 2020 Filing 8 CORRECTED ENTRY of Appearance by Nicholas P. Llewellyn for Defendant Andrew M. Saul. (Llewellyn, Nicholas) Modified on 12/31/2020 (CMH).
December 28, 2020 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by Nicholas P. Llewellyn for Defendant Andrew M. Saul. (Llewellyn, Nicholas)
December 23, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Timothy John Walker. Defendant Andrew M. Saul (US Attorney)served on 12/17/2020, answer due 2/16/2021. (TMT)
December 8, 2020 Summons Issued as to defendant Andrew M. Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. The summons was mailed to U.S. Marshal - St. Louis. (CMH)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER This case is assigned to Track: 4: Social Security Appeal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Noelle C. Collins on 12/07/20. (CMH)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis [#2] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall issue process or cause process to issue on the complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Noelle C. Collins on 12/07/20. (CMH)
December 4, 2020 Filing 3 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (FLJ)
December 4, 2020 Case Opening Notification: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Judge Assigned: U.S. Magistrate Judge Noelle C. Collins. (CSG)
December 3, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Timothy John Walker. (Overton, Kathleen)
December 3, 2020 Filing 1 Social Security COMPLAINT Non-Jury Demand,Yes or No - Yes,, filed by Timothy John Walker. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Summons Atty General, #4 Summons OGC, #5 Summons US Atty)(Overton, Kathleen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walker v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Represented By: Nicholas P. Llewellyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy John Walker
Represented By: Kathleen E. Overton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?