Lett v. Saul
Plaintiff: Kellie Marie Lett
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Interested Party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Case Number: 1:2020cv00273
Filed: December 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Henry Edward Autrey
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 402
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by U.S. Marshal Service showing service on defendant by certified mail to Office of Regional Counsel on 2/8/21. (CSG)
February 12, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by U.S. Marshal Service showing service on defendant by certified mail to Attorney General on 1/27/21. (CSG)
January 21, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by U.S. Marshal Servcie. Defendant Andrew M. Saul served on 1/14/2021 through U.S. Attorney's Office, answer due 3/15/2021. (CSG)
January 19, 2021 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Nicholas P. Llewellyn for Defendant Andrew M. Saul. (Llewellyn, Nicholas)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: This case is assigned to Track: 4: Social Security Appeal. SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER SCHEDULING DEADLINES. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 1/4/21. (CSG)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis [#2] is GRANTED.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall issue process or cause process to issue on the complaint. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 1/4/21. (CSG)
January 4, 2021 Summonses Issued as to defendant Andrew M. Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. The summonses were mailed to U.S. Marshal Service, St. Louis, Missouri. (CSG)
December 28, 2020 Case Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Henry E. Autrey. (MRS)
December 28, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Kellie Marie Lett. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Financial Affidavit)(Tarry, Andrew)
December 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant All Defendants Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Kellie Marie Lett. (Attachments: #1 Original Filing Form Original Filing Form, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons Attorney General, #4 Summons Andrew Saul, #5 Summons US Attorney)(Tarry, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lett v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Represented By: Nicholas P. Llewellyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kellie Marie Lett
Represented By: Andrew R. Tarry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?