Coy's Honey Farm Inc v. Bayer Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Coy's Honey Farm Inc
Defendant: BASF Agricultural Solutions Seed US LLC, BASF Corporation, Bayer U.S., LLC, Bayer Corporation and Bayer CropScience Arkansas Inc
Case Number: 1:2021cv00089
Filed: June 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: Cape Girardeau Office
Presiding Judge: Stephen N Limbaugh
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: Phone conference held today with counsel for all parties and the Court participating. The stay in this matter is lifted. The deadline for filing responsive pleadings is set for August 25, 2021. BASF Agricultural Solutions Seed US LLC answer due 8/25/2021; BASF Corporation answer due 8/25/2021; Bayer Corporation answer due 8/25/2021; Bayer CropScience Arkansas Inc answer due 8/25/2021; Bayer U.S., LLC answer due 8/25/2021. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 08/04/2021. (CMH)
August 4, 2021 Filing 10 ENTRY of Appearance by Christopher M. Hohn for Defendants Bayer Corporation, Bayer CropScience Arkansas Inc, Bayer U.S., LLC. (Hohn, Christopher)
August 3, 2021 Filing 9 ENTRY of Appearance by Shane Alan Anderson for Defendant BASF Corporation. (Anderson, Shane)
August 3, 2021 Filing 8 ENTRY of Appearance by Carolyn A. Gunkel for Defendant BASF Corporation. (Gunkel, Carolyn)
August 3, 2021 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by Ross W. Johnson for Defendant BASF Corporation. (Johnson, Ross)
August 3, 2021 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by John P. Mandler for Defendant BASF Corporation. (Mandler, John)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, by July 15, 2021, plaintiff shall file an amended complaint in accordance with this memorandum. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if plaintiff does not timely and fully comply with this order, this matter will be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all other proceedings in this case are STAYED pending further order of this Court. Amended/Supplemental Pleadings due by 7/15/2021. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 06/15/21. (CMH)
June 14, 2021 Filing 4 Case transferred in from District of Arkansas Eastern; Case Number 3:21-cv-00104. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Case transferred in electronically.(DLB)
June 14, 2021 Filing 3 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-16) transferring this case to the U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri as part of MDL No. 2820, In Re: Dicamba Herbicides Litigation. Signed by the Clerk of the Panel John W. Nichols.(jak)
May 26, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #1 Complaint. CORRECTION: The original document was attached in error (wrong image file) due to a clerical mistake by the Clerk's office. The correct document was added to docket entry #1 and is attached hereto for review by the parties. (jak)
May 25, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Coy's Honey Farm Inc. Summons issued and returned to counsel for service. (Fee of $402 paid. Receipt Number LIT082243.) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jbh) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/26/2021: #2 Main Document - Correct) (jak).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coy's Honey Farm Inc v. Bayer Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BASF Agricultural Solutions Seed US LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BASF Corporation
Represented By: John P. Mandler
Represented By: Carolyn A. Gunkel
Represented By: Ross W. Johnson
Represented By: Shane Alan Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer U.S., LLC
Represented By: Christopher M. Hohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer Corporation
Represented By: Christopher M. Hohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer CropScience Arkansas Inc
Represented By: Christopher M. Hohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Coy's Honey Farm Inc
Represented By: Richard H. Mays
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?