Andy Timmons, Inc. d/b/a Lost Draw Vineyards, et al v. Bayer Crop Science, LP et al
Plaintiff: Andy Timmons, Inc. doing business as Lost Draw Vineyards, ALEGRIA DE LA VIDA VINEYARDS, LLC, ALTA LOMA VINEYARD PARTNERSHIP, All Plaintiffs, Benjamin Friesen, Bingham Family Vineyards, LLC, Rowdy Bolen, Tameisha Bolen, Bueno Suerte Vineyards, LLC, Castao Prado Vineyard, LLC, Mike West doing business as Challis Vineyards, Chase Lane doing business as Chase Lane Vineyard, Kendra Lane doing business as Chase Lane Vineyard, Gary Steven Brown doing business as Cooper Vineyard, Pamela Joyce Brown doing business as Cooper Vineyard, Russell Smothermon doing business as Corkscrew Vineyard, Sharlann Smothermon doing business as Corkscrew Vineyard, Cornelious Corporation, Cox Family Winegrowers, LLC doing business as Cox Family Vineyards, LT Investment Group, LLC doing business as Crazy Cluster Vineyard, Mary McKee doing business as Curvo Fila Vineyard, Daniels Farmland Trust, Ty Wilmeth doing business as Diamante Doble Dos Vineyards, Jeter Wilmeth doing business as Diamante Doble Vineyard, Gay Wilmeth doing business as Diamante Doble Vineyard, Larry Smith doing business as Dog Gone Vineyard, Sue Smith doing business as Dog Gone Vineyard, Donna Burgess Enterprises, LLC doing business as My Covenant, Dwayne Canada doing business as Canada Family Vineyard, Brenda Canada doing business as Canada Family Vineyard, Daniel Canada doing business as Canada Family Vineyard, Sawyer Farm Partnership doing business as The Family Vineyard, Lonnie Graham doing business as Five Star Vineyard, Penny Graham doing business as Five Star Vineyard, Dustin Gilliam doing business as Gilliam Gap Vineyards, Glenda Gilliam doing business as Gilliam Gap Vineyards, Gillmore Brothers, LP doing business as Gillmore Brothers Vineyard, Andis Applewhite doing business as Half Circle Cross Vineyard, La Pradera Vineyards, LLC, Lahey Farms, LLC, Lilli of the Vine Vineyards, Inc., AA Martin Partners, Ltd., Peggy Seeley doing business as Moonlight Vineyards, George Seeley doing business as Moonlight Vineyards, Narra Vineyards, LLC, Hilltop Winery at Paka Vineyards, LLC, Peggy Bingham doing business as Peggy Bingham Farms, Tony Phillips doing business as Phillips Vineyard, Madonna Phillips doing business as Phillips Vineyard, Reddy Vineyards, Inc., Rowland Taylor Vineyards, LLC, Clara Ann McPherson doing business as Sagmor Vineyards, Charles Seifert doing business as Seifert Stables & Vineyards, Cheryl Seifert doing business as Seifert Stables & Vineyards, Six Harts Vineyard, LLC, The Tom and Janice Henslee Living Trust, Doug Thomas doing business as Thomas Acres, Anissa Thomas doing business as Thomas Acres, Tony Hendricks doing business as Hendricks Family Vineyard, Bertha Hendricks doing business as Hendricks Family Vineyard, Carolyn Keane, Anna Winnell Young and Marjorie Jones Partnership doing business as Tucker Farms, Twin-T Vineyards, Inc., Joe Riddle doing business as UVA Morado Vineyards, Ronald Luker doing business as White Rock Vineyards, Margaret Luker doing business as White Rock Vineyards, Williams Ranch Vineyard, LLC, Larry Young doing business as Young Family Vineyards, Caprock Distributors, LLC, Steve Newsom, Cindy Newsom, Gabe Hisel, Newsom Family Farms, LLC, Ledlie Powell Individually and as Trustee of the Ledlie S. and Danette Powell Recovable Trust doing business as Newsom Powell Vineyard, Don Hill doing business as Don Hill Farms, Texas Custom Wine Works, LLC, Texas Winery Owners Group, LLC, Kim McPherson doing business as McPherson Cellars, Inc., Lynce Charles Carroll, Texas Wine Company, Inc. and AKG Realty, Inc.
Defendant: BAYER CROP SCIENCE, LP, Monsanto Company and BASF Corporation
Case Number: 1:2021cv00104
Filed: July 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Stephen N Limbaugh
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Docket Text ORDER: Motion to withdraw granted in 1:18MD2820 and all cases within the MDL in which Sonette Magnus has entered an appearance. The motion is termed as moot in all other cases in which Magnus has not entered an appearance. ; ORDERED GRANTED/TERMED, Attorney Sonette T. Magnus terminated.. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 10/15/21. Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02820-SNLJ et al.(MRS)
October 14, 2021 Filing 26 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney ;attorney/firm Sonette Magnus by Defendant E.I. Dupont De Nemours and Company. Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02820-SNLJ et al.(Magnus, Sonette)
September 17, 2021 Filing 25 REPLY to Response to Motion re #13 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Jefferson County, Texas filed by Plaintiff All Plaintiffs. (Dinnell, Adam)
September 17, 2021 Filing 24 REPLY to Response to Motion re #2 Motion to Sever filed by Defendant BASF Corporation. (Mandler, John)
August 31, 2021 Filing 23 RESPONSE in Opposition re #2 Motion to Sever filed by Plaintiff All Plaintiffs. (Dinnell, Adam)
August 31, 2021 Filing 22 RESPONSE in Opposition re #13 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Jefferson County, Texas and Joinder in BASFs Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Remand filed by Defendants BAYER CROP SCIENCE, LP, Monsanto Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hohn, Christopher)
August 31, 2021 Filing 21 RESPONSE in Opposition re #13 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Jefferson County, Texas filed by Defendant BASF Corporation. (Mandler, John)
August 4, 2021 Filing 20 ENTRY of Appearance by Christopher M. Hohn for Defendants BAYER CROP SCIENCE, LP, Monsanto Company. (Hohn, Christopher)
August 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: #2 filed by BASF Corporation, #13 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Jefferson County, Texas filed by Plaintiff All Plaintiffs. The briefing schedule for the pending motion to remand and motion to sever is as follows: Response briefs are due August 31, 2021, and reply briefs are due September 17, 2021. Proceedings in this matter are stayed in all other respects. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 8/4/21. (CSG)
August 3, 2021 Filing 18 ENTRY of Appearance by Shane Alan Anderson for Defendant BASF Corporation. (Anderson, Shane)
August 3, 2021 Filing 17 ENTRY of Appearance by Carolyn A. Gunkel for Defendant BASF Corporation. (Gunkel, Carolyn)
August 3, 2021 Filing 16 ENTRY of Appearance by Ross W. Johnson for Defendant BASF Corporation. (Johnson, Ross)
August 3, 2021 Filing 15 ENTRY of Appearance by John P. Mandler for Defendant BASF Corporation. (Mandler, John)
August 2, 2021 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #13 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Jefferson County, Texas filed by Plaintiff All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Paka Entity Information), #2 Exhibit 2 (Plaintiff Vineyard GPS Locations), #3 Exhibit 3 (Google Earth Image of GPS Locations), #4 Exhibit 4 (Plaintiff Vineyard Location Map 1), #5 Exhibit 5 (Plaintiff Vineyard Location Map 2), #6 Exhibit 6 (Jason Roberts Report - Dicamba Cloud), #7 Exhibit 7 (WSSA Article - Air Mass), #8 Exhibit 8 (Pesticides in the Atmosphere - USGS), #9 Exhibit 9 (Leaf Comparison Image), #10 Exhibit 10 (High Plains Symptomology Comparisons) C)(Dinnell, Adam)
August 2, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Jefferson County, Texas by Plaintiff All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dinnell, Adam)
July 16, 2021 Filing 12 Case transferred in from District of Texas Eastern; Case Number 1:21-cv-00338. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Case transferred in electronically.(DLB)
July 16, 2021 Filing 11 TRANSFER ORDER transferring case to the Eastern District of Missouri, Eastern Division for inclusion in MDL. 2820 in re DICAMBA HERBICIDES LITIGATION and assigned to the Honorable Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr. (signed by Clerk of the Panel) (kcv, )
July 16, 2021 Case Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: Honorable Stephen N. Limbaugh Jr.. Per Local Rule 12.01, attorneys who are not admitted to the Eastern District of Missouri do not need to apply for admission pro hac vice in order to practice on a case if they had already filed an entry of appearance before the case was transferred from another United States District Court. For more information, visit #attorney applications. (DLB)
July 9, 2021 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for BASF Corporation to 8/9/2021. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( kcv, )
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting the #7 Joint Motion to Stay. It is ordered that this case is stayed pending a decision from the JPML as to whether this action should be transferred to the Dicamba MDL and all other deadlines in this action are hereby vacated pending a decision from the JPML. It is also ordered that the Rule 16 Case Management Conference set for August 20, 2021 is hereby cancelled.Signed by District Judge Michael J. Truncale on 7/8/21. (kcv, )
July 8, 2021 Filing 8 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re BASF Corporation.( Vickery, Alan)
July 8, 2021 Filing 7 Joint MOTION to Stay by BASF Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Vickery, Alan)
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER directing the parties to conduct a Rule 26(f) Attorney Conference by July 27, 2021. Rule 16 Case Managment/Scheduling Conference set for 8/20/2021 at 10:00 AM in Room 221 (Beaumont) before District Judge Michael J. Truncale. Signed by District Judge Michael J. Truncale on 7/7/21. (kcv, )
July 7, 2021 ***FILED IN ERROR. Document # 6, Joint Motion to Stay. The motion did not contain all joining counsel signatures or in the alternative a certificate of conference. Counsel has been notified. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (kcv, )
July 7, 2021 Filing 6 ***FILED IN ERROR. Please ignore.***Joint MOTION to Stay by BASF Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Vickery, Alan) Modified on 7/8/2021 (kcv, ).
July 6, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Consent and Joinder by Bayer Crop Science, LP, Monsanto Company re #1 Notice of Removal, (Williams, Nicole) Modified title on 7/7/2021 (kcv, ).
July 2, 2021 Filing 4 ORIGINAL PETITION filed in State Court against BASF Corporation, Bayer Crop Science, LP, Monsanto Company, filed by All Plaintiffs.(kcv, )
July 2, 2021 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT/Certificate of Interested Parties filed by BASF Corporation (Vickery, Alan) Modified title on 7/6/2021 (kcv, ).
July 2, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION to Sever the claims of Plaintiff Hilltop Winery at Paka Vineyards, LLC by BASF Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Vickery, Alan)
July 2, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by BASF Corporation from Jefferson County, 60th Judicial District Cout, case number B-207748. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8479755), filed by BASF Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E)(Vickery, Alan)
July 2, 2021 Case Assigned to District Judge Michael J. Truncale. (kcv, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Andy Timmons, Inc. d/b/a Lost Draw Vineyards, et al v. Bayer Crop Science, LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andy Timmons, Inc. doing business as Lost Draw Vineyards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALEGRIA DE LA VIDA VINEYARDS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALTA LOMA VINEYARD PARTNERSHIP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: All Plaintiffs
Represented By: Andrew Sterling Hicks
Represented By: Adam Michael Dinnell
Represented By: Marc Samuel Tabolsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin Friesen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bingham Family Vineyards, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rowdy Bolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tameisha Bolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bueno Suerte Vineyards, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Castao Prado Vineyard, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mike West doing business as Challis Vineyards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chase Lane doing business as Chase Lane Vineyard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kendra Lane doing business as Chase Lane Vineyard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Steven Brown doing business as Cooper Vineyard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Joyce Brown doing business as Cooper Vineyard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Russell Smothermon doing business as Corkscrew Vineyard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharlann Smothermon doing business as Corkscrew Vineyard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cornelious Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cox Family Winegrowers, LLC doing business as Cox Family Vineyards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LT Investment Group, LLC doing business as Crazy Cluster Vineyard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary McKee doing business as Curvo Fila Vineyard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniels Farmland Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ty Wilmeth doing business as Diamante Doble Dos Vineyards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeter Wilmeth doing business as Diamante Doble Vineyard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gay Wilmeth doing business as Diamante Doble Vineyard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Smith doing business as Dog Gone Vineyard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sue Smith doing business as Dog Gone Vineyard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Burgess Enterprises, LLC doing business as My Covenant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dwayne Canada doing business as Canada Family Vineyard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Canada doing business as Canada Family Vineyard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Canada doing business as Canada Family Vineyard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sawyer Farm Partnership doing business as The Family Vineyard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lonnie Graham doing business as Five Star Vineyard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Penny Graham doing business as Five Star Vineyard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dustin Gilliam doing business as Gilliam Gap Vineyards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glenda Gilliam doing business as Gilliam Gap Vineyards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gillmore Brothers, LP doing business as Gillmore Brothers Vineyard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andis Applewhite doing business as Half Circle Cross Vineyard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: La Pradera Vineyards, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lahey Farms, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lilli of the Vine Vineyards, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AA Martin Partners, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peggy Seeley doing business as Moonlight Vineyards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Seeley doing business as Moonlight Vineyards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Narra Vineyards, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hilltop Winery at Paka Vineyards, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peggy Bingham doing business as Peggy Bingham Farms
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tony Phillips doing business as Phillips Vineyard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Madonna Phillips doing business as Phillips Vineyard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reddy Vineyards, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rowland Taylor Vineyards, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clara Ann McPherson doing business as Sagmor Vineyards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Seifert doing business as Seifert Stables & Vineyards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheryl Seifert doing business as Seifert Stables & Vineyards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Six Harts Vineyard, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Tom and Janice Henslee Living Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doug Thomas doing business as Thomas Acres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anissa Thomas doing business as Thomas Acres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tony Hendricks doing business as Hendricks Family Vineyard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bertha Hendricks doing business as Hendricks Family Vineyard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolyn Keane, Anna Winnell Young and Marjorie Jones Partnership doing business as Tucker Farms
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Twin-T Vineyards, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Riddle doing business as UVA Morado Vineyards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Luker doing business as White Rock Vineyards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret Luker doing business as White Rock Vineyards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Williams Ranch Vineyard, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Young doing business as Young Family Vineyards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caprock Distributors, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Newsom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cindy Newsom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gabe Hisel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Newsom Family Farms, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ledlie Powell Individually and as Trustee of the Ledlie S. and Danette Powell Recovable Trust doing business as Newsom Powell Vineyard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Don Hill doing business as Don Hill Farms
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Texas Custom Wine Works, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Texas Winery Owners Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kim McPherson doing business as McPherson Cellars, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynce Charles Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Texas Wine Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AKG Realty, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAYER CROP SCIENCE, LP
Represented By: Nicole Leigh Williams
Represented By: Christopher M. Hohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Represented By: Nicole Leigh Williams
Represented By: Christopher M. Hohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BASF Corporation
Represented By: Alan R Vickery
Represented By: John P. Mandler
Represented By: Carolyn A. Gunkel
Represented By: Ross W. Johnson
Represented By: Shane Alan Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?