Hurley & Associates Agri Marketing Centers of Charleston, Inc. v. Hiscox Insurance Company Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Hurley & Associates Agri Marketing Centers of Charleston, Inc.
Defendant: Hiscox Insurance Company Inc. and Gateway Underwriters Agency, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv00139
Filed: September 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Stephen N Limbaugh
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2021 Filing 16 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff Hurley & Associates Agri Marketing Centers of Charleston, Inc... (Collins, Thomas)
November 4, 2021 Filing 15 Electronic Notice of Noncompliance - Review of this case shows the Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate has not been filed by Plaintiff Hurley & Associates Agri Marketing Centers of Charleston, Inc.. The certificate must be filed with the Court within 5 days # (moed-0001.pdf). Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate due by 11/15/2021. (CMH)
November 4, 2021 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Circuit Court of Mississippi County, Missoui Defendants' Opposition to Hurley's Motion to Remand filed by Defendant Gateway Underwriters Agency, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Brown, Ryan)
October 25, 2021 Filing 13 ENTRY of Appearance by Diedre Abigail Peters for Plaintiff Hurley & Associates Agri Marketing Centers of Charleston, Inc.. (Peters, Diedre)
October 22, 2021 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #11 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Circuit Court of Mississippi County, Missoui filed by Plaintiff Hurley & Associates Agri Marketing Centers of Charleston, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A-Return of Service of Summons, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Affidavit)(Collins, Thomas)
October 22, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Circuit Court of Mississippi County, Missoui by Plaintiff Hurley & Associates Agri Marketing Centers of Charleston, Inc.. (Collins, Thomas)
October 5, 2021 Filing 10 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Gateway Underwriters Agency, Inc.. Parent companies: None, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: Berkshire Hathaway Inc., a Delaware corporation, owns 80% of the stock of Gateway Underwriters Agency, Inc. The other 20% is owned by a private individual,. (Brown, Ryan)
October 4, 2021 Filing 9 Electronic Notice re: Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate to Defendant Gateway Underwriters Agency, Inc., Plaintiff Hurley & Associates Agri Marketing Centers of Charleston, Inc.. Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every non-governmental organizational party must file a Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate within ten (10) days of the party's first pleading or entry of appearance. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible # (moed-0001.pdf). Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate due by 10/13/2021. (CMH)
September 29, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss Party Gateway Underwriters, Inc. by Defendants Gateway Underwriters Agency, Inc., Hiscox Insurance Company Inc.. (Brown, Ryan)
September 29, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by Hiscox Insurance Company Inc..(Brown, Ryan)
September 23, 2021 Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh Jr.. All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). (CMH)
September 22, 2021 Filing 6 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court of Mississippi County, filed by Hurley & Associates Agri Marketing Centers of Charleston, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(CMH)
September 22, 2021 Filing 5 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Defendants Gateway Underwriters Agency, Inc., Hiscox Insurance Company Inc.. Amendment to #3 Notice of Filing Exhibit Original Filing Form. (Brown, Ryan)
September 22, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendants Gateway Underwriters Agency, Inc., Hiscox Insurance Company Inc. Sent To: State Court - Executed (Brown, Ryan)
September 22, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Filing Exhibit with the Clerk's Office in paper format by Defendants Gateway Underwriters Agency, Inc., Hiscox Insurance Company Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal Petition, (Brown, Ryan)
September 22, 2021 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Hiscox Insurance Company Inc.. Parent companies: ALTHOA, Inc., Subsidiaries: HHiscox Insurance Company, Publicly held company: Hiscox Ltd. a Bermuda Corporation that is publicly traded on the London Stock Exchange,. (Brown, Ryan)
September 22, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Mississippi County, Missouri, case number 21MI-CV00362, with receipt number AMOEDC-8881837, in the amount of $402 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Gateway Underwriters Agency, Inc., Hiscox Insurance Company Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Notice of Service, #3 Exhibit 3 - Declaration of Sara Clayton, #4 Exhibit 4 - Declaration of William Martin, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Brown, Ryan)
September 22, 2021 ***REMARK - Attorney notified to file Original Filing Form, Corporate Disclosure and Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal. (CMH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hurley & Associates Agri Marketing Centers of Charleston, Inc. v. Hiscox Insurance Company Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hurley & Associates Agri Marketing Centers of Charleston, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas W. Collins, III
Represented By: Diedre Abigail Peters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hiscox Insurance Company Inc.
Represented By: Ryan T. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gateway Underwriters Agency, Inc.
Represented By: Ryan T. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?