Wilson v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Eric W. Wilson
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Interested Party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Case Number: 1:2021cv00156
Filed: October 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Matthew T Schelp
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2021 Filing 7 CERTIFIED Social Security Transcript Notice of Filing by Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi (Attachments: #1 Transcript 1, #2 Transcript 2, #3 Transcript 3, #4 Transcript 4, #5 Transcript 5, #6 Transcript 6, #7 Transcript 7, #8 Transcript 8, #9 Transcript 9, #10 Transcript 10, #11 Transcript 11, #12 Transcript 12, #13 Transcript 13, #14 Transcript 14, #15 Transcript 15, #16 Transcript 16, #17 Transcript 17, #18 Transcript 18, #19 Transcript 19, #20 Transcript 20, #21 Transcript 21, #22 Transcript 22, #23 Transcript 23, #24 Transcript 24, #25 Transcript 25, #26 Transcript 26, #27 Transcript 27, #28 Transcript 28, #29 Transcript 29, #30 Transcript 30, #31 Transcript 31, #32 Transcript 32)(Llewellyn, Nicholas)
November 3, 2021 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Nicholas P. Llewellyn for Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi. (Llewellyn, Nicholas)
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER This case is assigned to Track: 4: Social Security Appeal. Signed by District Judge Matthew T. Schelp on 10/27/2021. (CMH)
October 27, 2021 Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Matthew T. Schelp. (CMH)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER re #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Eric W. Wilson: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis [#2] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall issue process or cause process to issue on the complaint. Signed by District Judge Matthew T. Schelp on 10/26/2021. (CMH)
October 26, 2021 Filing 3 SOCIAL SECURITY IDENTIFICATION FORM as to Plaintiff Eric W. Wilson. (Young, Kelsey)
October 26, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Eric W. Wilson. (Young, Kelsey)
October 26, 2021 Filing 1 Social Security COMPLAINT Non-Jury Demand,Yes or No - Yes,, filed by Eric W. Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form)(Young, Kelsey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilson v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric W. Wilson
Represented By: Kelsey Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: USAO SSA Division
Represented By: Nicholas P. Llewellyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?