Croy v. Butler County Justice Center et al
Plaintiff: Amy Kristen Croy
Defendant: Butler County Justice Center, John Doe and Jane Doe
Case Number: 1:2021cv00169
Filed: November 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: John A Ross
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 4. Along with two copies of the Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint form as ordered by the Court. Mon Dec 6 10:08:22 CST 2021 (Hency, Christy)
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis under 42:1983 (prisoner) filed by Plaintiff Amy Kristen Croy: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis [ECF No. 2] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff must pay an initial filing fee of $20.00 within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. Plaintiff is instructed to make her remittance payable to Clerk, United States District Court, and to include upon it: (1) her name; (2) her prison registration number; (3) the case number; and (4) the statement that the remittance is for an original proceeding. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall mail to plaintiff two blank Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint forms. Plaintiff may request additional forms as needed. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff must file an amended complaint on the Courts form within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. Plaintiff is advised that her amended complaint will take the place of her original complaint and will be the only pleading that this Court will review. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if plaintiff fails to timely comply with this Memorandum and Order, the Court will dismiss this action without prejudice and without further notice. (Amended/Supplemental Pleadings due by 1/3/2022. Initial Partial Filing Fee due by 1/3/2022.) Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 12/3/21. (CMH)
November 23, 2021 ***Complaint Letter Processed (see notice of electronic filing for distribution list) Tue Nov 23 09:01:08 CST 2021 (admin,)
November 23, 2021 ***Complaint Letter Created. This is to advise you that this office has received and filed your complaint and has assigned it the above-referenced case number. (CMH)
November 23, 2021 Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge John A. Ross. (CMH)
November 19, 2021 Filing 3 Certified Inmate Account Statement by Plaintiff Amy Kristen Croy. (CMH)
November 19, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis under 42:1983 (prisoner) by Plaintiff Amy Kristen Croy. (CMH)
November 19, 2021 Filing 1 DCM COMPLAINT against defendant All Defendants Jury Demand,, filed by Amy Kristen Croy. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Envelope)(CMH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Croy v. Butler County Justice Center et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Kristen Croy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Butler County Justice Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?