Barnes v. Winson et al
Plaintiff: Bernard Kirk Barnes
Defendant: Joshua Winson, Kenny Wilson and City of Kennett
Case Number: 1:2022cv00128
Filed: October 5, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: John A Ross
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER..IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendants' motion to consolidate (Docket No. 8) is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Barnes v. Watson, No. 1 :22-cv-129-SRC (E.D. Mo.)is consolidated into Barnes v. Winson, et al., No. 1 :22-cv-128-JAR (E.D. Mo.) for all remaining proceedings. All future documents shall be filed in Barnes v. Winson, et al., No. 'I:22-cv-128-JAR(E.D. Mo.). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall send to plaintiff a copy of the Court's prisoner civil rights complaint form.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff shall file an amended complaint on the Court provided form within thirty (30) days of the date of this order.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if plaintiff fails to file an amended complaint on the Court-provided form within thirty (30) days of the date of this order, this action will be dismissed without prejudice and without further notice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendants' motion to quash (Docket No. 4) andmotion to dismiss (Docket No. 5) are DENIED AS MOOT as plaintiff is being ordered to file an amended complaint. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Barnes v. Watson, No. 1:22-cv-129-SRC (E.D. Mo.) shall be ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED with the filing of this ORDER. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a copy of this Memorandum and Order shall be docketed in Barnesv. Watson, No. 1:22-cv-129-SRC (E.D. Mo.).( Amended/Supplemental Pleadings due by 12/30/2022.). Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 11/30/22. (MRS)
November 30, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 14. w/ copy of Prisoner Civil Rights complaint as ordered Wed Nov 30 11:59:44 CST 2022 (Schaefer, Michelle)
November 9, 2022 Filing 13 REPLY to Response to Motion re #8 MOTION to Consolidate Cases Consolidate with higher case number 1:22-CV-00129-NCC filed by Defendants City of Kennett, Kenny Wilson. (Bertels, Ryan)
November 9, 2022 Filing 12 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendants City of Kennett, Kenny Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss)(Bertels, Ryan)
November 3, 2022 Filing 11 RESPONSE to Motion re #8 MOTION to Consolidate Cases Consolidate with higher case number 1:22-CV-00129-NCC filed by Plaintiff Bernard Kirk Barnes. (JMC)
October 31, 2022 Filing 10 RESPONSE to Motion re #5 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Plaintiff Bernard Kirk Barnes. (JMC)
October 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file any response or consent to Defendants motion to consolidate no later than November 7, 2022. The Clerk of the Court is directed to provide Plaintiff a copy of the motion (Doc. 6) with this order. Response to Court due by 11/7/2022. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 10/25/22. (CMH)
October 25, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 9. Tue Oct 25 09:58:14 CDT 2022 (Hency, Christy)
October 6, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION to Consolidate Cases Consolidate with higher case number 1:22-CV-00129-NCC by Defendants City of Kennett, Kenny Wilson, Joshua Winson. (Bertels, Ryan)
October 5, 2022 Filing 7 REASSIGNMENT ORDER (GJL): [COPY OF ORDER AS ENTERED IN 4:22-cv-01062-UNA]IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the above styled case is transferred to the Southeastern Division and assigned to the Honorable John A. Ross, United States District Judge, under case number 1:22-cv-00128-JAR. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that case number 4:22-cv-01062-UNA be administratively closed. (JDC)
October 5, 2022 Filing 6 Complaint (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court of Dunklin County, filed by Bernard Kirk Barnes.(JDC) Modified on 10/7/2022 (CMH).
October 5, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Defendants City of Kennett, Kenny Wilson, Joshua Winson. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 22DU-CR00865-01 Docket Sheet)(Bertels, Ryan)
October 5, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION to Quash Service of Process and Special and Limited Entry of Appearance by Defendants City of Kennett, Kenny Wilson, Joshua Winson. (Bertels, Ryan)
October 5, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendants City of Kennett, Kenny Wilson Sent To: Plaintiff (Bertels, Ryan)
October 5, 2022 Filing 2 Original Filing Form . (Bertels, Ryan) Modified on 10/5/2022 to correct event used (JDC).
October 5, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Dunklin, case number 22DU-CC00074, with receipt number AMOEDC-9542493, in the amount of $402 Jury Demand,, filed by Kenny Wilson, City of Kennett. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Attachment State Court Notice of Removal, #3 State Court Petition, #4 Attachment State Court Docket Sheet)(Bertels, Ryan) Modified on 10/5/2022 (JDC).
October 5, 2022 Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: Honorable John A. Ross. (JDC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barnes v. Winson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bernard Kirk Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua Winson
Represented By: Ryan E. Bertels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenny Wilson
Represented By: Ryan E. Bertels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Kennett
Represented By: Ryan E. Bertels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?