Lemmons v. Chambers et al
Plaintiff: Victor Lemmons, Jr.
Defendant: John Chambers, Trevor Unknown, Faith Unknown, Dave Unknown, Daniel Unknown, Baliva Unknown, Trevor Kilmer, Faith Doe, Dave Doe, Daniel Doe and T. Baliva
Case Number: 1:2023cv00029
Filed: March 6, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Shirley Padmore Mensah
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 27, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 27, 2023 Filing 11 Letter from Clerk sent to pro-se prisoner re:FRAP - all procedures for filing Notice of Appeal (copy of motion to proceed IFP on appeal attached and mailed) (MRS)
April 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE...In accordance with the Memorandum and Order of this date and incorporated herein, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this action is DISMISSED without prejudice. IT IS HEREBY CERTIFIED that an appeal from this order of dismissal would not be taken in good faith. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 4/27/23. (MRS)
April 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER...IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk shall not issue process or cause process to issue upon the amended complaint because it fails to state a claim upon which relief can be granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this action is DISMISSED without prejudice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B).IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs motion for appointment of counsel [ECFNo. 8] is DENIED as moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that an appeal from this dismissal would not be taken in good faith. An Order of Dismissal shall accompany this Memorandum and Order. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 4/27/23. (MRS)
April 27, 2023 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 9,10,11. Thu Apr 27 15:54:12 CDT 2023 (Schaefer, Michelle)
April 17, 2023 Filing 8 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Plaintiff Victor Lemmons, Jr. (MRS)
April 17, 2023 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant T. Baliva, John Chambers, Daniel Doe, Dave Doe, Faith Doe, Trevor Kilmer Amendment to #1 DCM Complaint Jury Demand demand,, filed by Victor Lemmons, Jr. Related document: #1 DCM Complaint filed by Victor Lemmons, Jr..(MRS)
March 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: #3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Plaintiff Victor Lemmons, Jr., #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis under 42:1983 (prisoner) filed by Plaintiff Victor Lemmons, Jr.: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis [ECF No. 2] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff shall pay an initial filing fee of $1.00 within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. Plaintiff is instructed to make his remittance payable to Clerk, United States District Court, and to include upon it: (1) his name; (2) his prison registration number; (3) the case number; and (4) that the remittance is for an original proceeding. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall mail to plaintiff two blank Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint forms. Plaintiff may request additional forms as needed. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for appointment of counsel [ECF No. 3] is DENIED at this time without prejudice. IT IS FINALLY ORDERED that if plaintiff fails to comply with this Order, the Court will dismiss this action without prejudice and without further notice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff shall file an amended complaint on the Court-provided form in accordance with the instructions stated above within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. Plaintiff is advised that his amended complaint will take the place of his original filing and will be the only pleading that this Court will review. (Amended/Supplemental Pleadings due by 4/17/2023., Initial Partial Filing Fee due by 4/17/2023.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Shirley Padmore Mensah on 03/17/23. (CMH)
March 17, 2023 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: Along with two blank Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint forms. (see receipt) Docket No: 6. Fri Mar 17 12:03:38 CDT 2023 (Hency, Christy) Modified on 3/17/2023 (CMH).
March 10, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of Change of Address by Plaintiff Victor Lemmons, Jr. (JMC)
March 8, 2023 Filing 4 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (Potter, Jacob)
March 8, 2023 ***Complaint Letter Created. This is to advise you that this office has received and filed your complaint and has assigned it the above-referenced case number. (JMC)
March 8, 2023 Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: U.S. Magistrate Judge Shirley P. Mensah. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. (JMC)
March 8, 2023 ***Complaint Letter Processed (see notice of electronic filing for distribution list) Wed Mar 8 13:01:09 CST 2023 (admin,)
March 6, 2023 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Plaintiff Victor Lemmons, Jr. (JMC)
March 6, 2023 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis under 42:1983 (prisoner) by Plaintiff Victor Lemmons, Jr. (JMC)
March 6, 2023 Filing 1 DCM COMPLAINT against defendant All Defendants jury Demand,, filed by Victor Lemmons, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Envelope, #2 Original Filing Form)(JMC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lemmons v. Chambers et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor Lemmons, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Chambers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trevor Unknown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Faith Unknown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dave Unknown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Unknown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baliva Unknown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trevor Kilmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Faith Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dave Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Baliva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?