Delay v. Ferrell, et al
Plaintiff: Tyson Delay and Hubert Lloyd Tyson Delay, III
Defendant: Britton Ferrell and Barry Morgan
Case Number: 1:2024cv00203
Filed: November 1, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Stephen N Limbaugh
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 16, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2024 Filing 4 Letter from Clerk sent to pro-se prisoner re:FRAP - all procedures for filing Notice of Appeal (copy of motion to proceed IFP on appeal attached and mailed) (ANR)
December 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER OF DISMISSAL: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this action is DISMISSED without prejudice. IT IS HEREBY CERTIFIED that an appeal would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Sr. District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 12/16/2024. (ANR)
December 16, 2024 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 3, 4. Mon Dec 16 11:42:36 CST 2024 (Reichert, Alexis)
November 5, 2024 Filing 2 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER..IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall mail to plaintiff copies of the Court's Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint form, the Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis-Prisoner Cases form, the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Under 28 U.S.C. 2241 Court Form and the Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis - and Affidavit Habeas Cases form. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, within twenty-one (21) days of the date of this Order, plaintiff shall file an amended complaint on the Court's Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint form andin compliance with the Court's instructions. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, within twenty-one (21) days of the date ofthis Order, plaintiff shall either pay the filing fee or submit a motion to proceed in forma pauperis on the Prisoner Cases Court-provided form. If plaintiff files a motion to proceed in forma pauperis, he shall also submit a certified copy of his inmate account statement for the six-month period immediately preceding the filing of the complaint.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if plaintiff wishes to pursue his excessive bail or denial of bond claims he must file a separate action on a Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Under 28U.S.C. 2241 Court Form. Amended/Supplemental Pleadings due by 11/26/2024.. Signed by Sr. District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 11/5/24. (MRS)
November 5, 2024 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 2. w/ copies of Court's Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint form, the Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis-Prisoner Cases form, the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Under 28 U.S.C. 2241 Court Form and the Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis - and Affidavit Habeas Cases form Tue Nov 5 13:46:36 CST 2024 (Schaefer, Michelle)
November 4, 2024 Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh Jr.. (CMH)
November 4, 2024 ***Complaint Letter Created. This is to advise you that this office has received and filed your complaint and has assigned it the above-referenced case number. (CMH)
November 4, 2024 ***Complaint Letter Processed (see notice of electronic filing for distribution list) Mon Nov 4 15:00:44 CST 2024 (admin,)
November 1, 2024 Filing 1 DCM COMPLAINT against defendant All Defendants, filed by Hubert Lloyd Tyson Delay, III. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(CMH) (Main Document 1 replaced on 11/4/2024) (CMH).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Delay v. Ferrell, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyson Delay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hubert Lloyd Tyson Delay, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Britton Ferrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barry Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?