Gater v. Caldwell et al
Plaintiff: Jerry L. Gater
Defendant: Tori Caldwell and Unknown Rukstad
Case Number: 1:2024cv00207
Filed: November 6, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Matthew T Schelp
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER of USCA as to #9 Notice of Appeal filed by Jerry L. Gater Regarding: Order to Show Cause USCA Appeal #: 24-3516 (CMH)
December 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER of USCA as to #9 Notice of Appeal filed by Jerry L. Gater Regarding: Submission of non-electronic documents, if any. USCA Appeal #: 24-3516 (CMH)
December 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER of USCA as to #9 Notice of Appeal filed by Jerry L. Gater Regarding: The $605 appellate filing and docketing fee has not been paid and is due. USCA Appeal #: 24-3516 (CMH)
December 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Initial Notification from USCA for #9 Notice of Appeal filed by Jerry L. Gater USCA Appeal Number: 24-3516(CMH)
December 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTIFICATION OF APPEAL AND NOA SUPPLEMENT by clerk to USCA regarding #9 Notice of Appeal. Notice of Appeal filed on 12/06/2024 by Plaintiff Jerry L. Gater. NOTIFICATION TO COUNSEL AND PRO SE PARTY: FILE REQUEST FOR TRANSCRIPT WITH DISTRICT COURT CLERKS OFFICE.(CMH)
December 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #7 Memorandum Opinion by Plaintiff Jerry L. Gater. [Address updated in CM/ECF this date](ANR)
December 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER OF DISMISSAL...IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this action is DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Matthew T. Schelp on 12/3/2024. (NEP)
December 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MEMORANDUM OPINION...On November 08, 2024, the Court ordered Plaintiff to file a First Amended Complaint using the Court-provided civil complaint form as required by the Court's Local Rule. See Doc. #5 (citing E.D. Mo. L.R. 2.06(A) (providing that self-represented plaintiffs must bring all actions on applicable forms)); see also Martinez v. Union Pac. R. Co., 82 F.3d 223, 227 (8th Cir. 1996) (noting the Court of Appeals "has upheld strict compliance by trial courts with their local rules"); Hinterberger v. City of Indianapolis, 966 F.3d 523, 528 (7th Cir. 2020) (explaining that "district courts may require strict compliance with their local rules"). In the Order, the Court admonished Plaintiff that, if he failed to comply, his failure would result in the dismissal of this action without further notice. Nevertheless, Plaintiff failed to comply, and the time for him to do so has passed. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 6(a) (computing time). Because Plaintiff failed to comply, the Court will enter an Order of Dismissal herewith dismissing this action without prejudice. See Hutchins v. A.G. Edwards & Sons, Inc., 116 F.3d 1256, 1259 (8th Cir. 1997) ("A district court has the power to dismiss a litigant's cause of action when the litigant fails to comply with the court's orders."); Brent v. Hyundai Motor's Am., 679 F. App'x 976, 977 (11th Cir. 2017) (per curiam) (district courts may sua sponte dismiss a case for a plaintiff's failure to comply with a court order). Signed by District Judge Matthew T. Schelp on 12/3/2024. (NEP)
November 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CJRA ORDER (NMG). Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Cohen termed. Case reassigned to District Judge Matthew T. Schelp for all further proceedings. (CMH)
November 19, 2024 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 6. Tue Nov 19 11:15:55 CST 2024 (Hency, Christy)
November 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk is directed to mail Plaintiff a copy of the Court's civil complaint form. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff must file and amended complaint on the Court-provided form within twenty-one (21) days of the date of this Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED if Plaintiff fails to comply with this Order, the Court will dismiss this action without prejudice and without further notice to Plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Cohen on 11/8/2024. (JMC) (Complaint form forwarded to Gater)Modified on 11/12/2024 (MRS).
November 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Request for Electronic Noticing from Jerry Gater. Email Address will be added to the party's record. (JMC)
November 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (auto)
November 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis under 42:1983 (prisoner) by Plaintiff Jerry L. Gater. (MRS)
November 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 1 DCM COMPLAINT against defendant Tori Caldwell, Unknown Rukstad, filed by Jerry L. Gater.(MRS)
November 6, 2024 Opinion or Order ***Complaint Letter Processed (see notice of electronic filing for distribution list) Wed Nov 6 16:00:48 CST 2024 (admin,)
November 6, 2024 Opinion or Order ***Complaint Letter Created. This is to advise you that this office has received and filed your complaint and has assigned it the above-referenced case number. (MRS)
November 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: U.S. Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Cohen. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. (MRS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gater v. Caldwell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tori Caldwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Rukstad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry L. Gater
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?