Adams v. Campbell et al
Plaintiff: John Q. Adams
Defendant: Thomas Cabrera, Corizon Medical Services, Inc., T. Bredeman, Elizabeth Conley, Robert Griggs, Chantey Goddert, Doug Prudden, Unknown Vetter and Gary Campbell
Case Number: 2:2012cv00024
Filed: March 27, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: Hannibal Office
County: Pike
Presiding Judge: Henry E. Autrey
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 75 OPINION,MEMORANDUM AND ORDER- IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, [Doc. No. 54 ] is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that judgment in their favor shall be entered. when all remaining issues herein have been resolved. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Autrey on 01/29/2014. (CLK)
January 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 74 OPINION,MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration pursuant to Rule 59 (e) and 60 (b), [Doc. No. 52 ], is denied. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Autrey on 01/13/2014. (CLK)
March 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 49 OPINION, MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 18 HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants Chantey Goddert, Robert Griggs, Doug Prudden and Melissa Vetter's Motion for Summary Judgment [ECF No. 18 ] is GRANTED and Plaintiff's Count II is dismissed. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Autrey on 03/13/13. (CLK)
April 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF PARTIAL DISMISSAL pursuant to 28 U.S.C.1915(e)(2)(B) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs 42 U.S.C. §§ 1981 and 1985(3) claims are DISMISSED, without prejudice. See 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B). IT IS HEREBY CERTIFIED that an appeal from this dismissal would not be taken in good faith. See 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3). Signed by Honorable Henry E. Autrey on 4/6/12. (CLA)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adams v. Campbell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Cabrera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corizon Medical Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Bredeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth Conley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Griggs
Represented By: John D. Hoelzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chantey Goddert
Represented By: John D. Hoelzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doug Prudden
Represented By: John D. Hoelzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Vetter
Represented By: John D. Hoelzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Q. Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?