Gettimier v. Burse, et al
Plaintiff: Christian M. Gettimier
Defendant: Stephen Korte, Mark A. Burse and Pike County, Missouri
Case Number: 2:2013cv00044
Filed: April 4, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: Hannibal Office
County: St. Louis - County
Presiding Judge: David D. Noce
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 36 OPINION, MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants Pike County Missouri and Sheriff Stephen Kortes Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint [Doc. No. 34 ] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff is given 14 days from the date of this Opinion, Memorandum and Order to file an amended complaint. ( Response to Court due by 1/20/2015.). Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 01/06/2015. (CLK)
May 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 27 OPINION, MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 24 ORDERED that Defendant Pike County, Missouri and Sheriff Stephen Korte's Motion to Dismiss, [Doc. No. 24], is granted. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff is given 14 days from the date of this Opinion, Memorandum and Order to file an amended complaint. ( Response to Court due by 6/3/2014.). Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 5/20/14. (CEL)
January 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 20 OPINION, MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 5 ORDERED that Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, [Doc. No. 5], is granted. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff may file an Amended Complaint within 14 days from the date of this Opinion, Memorandum and Order. ( Amended/Supplemental Pleadings due by 1/29/2014.) Signed by District Judge Henry E. Autrey on 1/15/14. (CEL)
May 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, or In the Alternative to Strike and Defendants [sic] Pike County, Missouri and Stephen Korte's Motion for Change of Venue 5 is GRANTED, in part. This case is transferred to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri, Northern Division. The Court does not rule on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and that motion remains pending. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 5/29/13. (LAH)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gettimier v. Burse, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christian M. Gettimier
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Korte
Represented By: John B. Morthland
Represented By: Amy L. Ohnemus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark A. Burse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pike County, Missouri
Represented By: John B. Morthland
Represented By: Amy L. Ohnemus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?