Martin v. Hurley et al
Plaintiff: Yaphet Martin
Defendant: James Hurley, A. Sherman and Unknown Carsey
Case Number: 2:2013cv00048
Filed: May 29, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: Hannibal Office
County: Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Shirley P. Mensah
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 95 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: For the foregoing reasons, Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. 80) is GRANTED. The Court will issue a separate judgment consistent with this Memorandum and Order.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shirley P. Mensah on 11/5/15. (LGK)
August 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 51 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's contested motions to (1) amend the Case Management Order to reopen discovery and extend the deadline for amendment of pleadings and joinder of additional parties (Doc. No. 36) and (2) defer ruling on Defendants' motion for summary judgment pending completion of the additional discovery. (Doc. No. 38) are GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that within ten (10) days of the date of this order, the parties shall submit a Joint Proposed Scheduling Plan proposing deadlines by which additional discovery will be completed and a briefing schedule on Defendants' motion for summary judgment.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shirley P. Mensah on 8/12/14. (LGK)
September 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 14 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant James Hurley, Defendant Unknown Carsey, Defendant A. Sherman motion is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shirley P. Mensah on 9/6/13. (LGK)
July 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to amend ECF No. 9 is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shirley P. Mensah on 7/9/13. (ARL)
June 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Courts Memorandum and Order [ECF No. 4] and Order of Dismissal [ECF No. 5] dated June 7, 2013, are VACATED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall reopen this action.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that th e Clerk shall issue process or cause process to issue on the complaint. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, pursuant to 42 U.S.C. § 1997e(g)(2), Defendants shall reply to Plaintiffs claims within the time provided by the applicable provisions of Rule 12(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure., Case reopened. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 6/26/13. (JWJ)
June 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs motion to proceed in forma pauperis [Doc. 2] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Plaintiff shall pay an initial filing fee of $7.03 within thirty (30) days of the date of this Orde r. Plaintiff is instructed to make his remittance payable to Clerk, United States District Court, and to include upon it: (1) his name; (2) his prison registration number; (3) the case number; and (4) that the remittance is for an original proceeding . IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall not issue process or cause process to issue upon the complaint because the complaint is legally frivolous or fails to state a claim upon which relief can be granted, or both. An Order of Dismissal will acc ompany this Memorandum and Order. re: 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis under 42:1983 (prisoner) filed by Plaintiff Yaphet Martin ( Initial Partial Filing Fee due by 7/7/2013.) Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 6/7/13. (JWJ)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martin v. Hurley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yaphet Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Hurley
Represented By: Joel A. Poole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Sherman
Represented By: Joel A. Poole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Carsey
Represented By: Joel A. Poole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?