Burns, et al v. Carlson, et al.
Plaintiff: Amanda Burns and Randall E. Burns
Defendant: County of Linn, Missouri, Tracy Carlson and City of Brookfield, Missouri
Case Number: 2:2013cv00088
Filed: October 3, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: Hannibal Office
County: Linn
Presiding Judge: Catherine D. Perry
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this action is DISMISSED without prejudice. A separate Order of Dismissal will be filed contemporaneously. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on November 13, 2013. (BRP)
October 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. (see order for details) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs shall file an amended complaint no later than November 15, 2013. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for extension of time is DENIED. [ECF No. 5 ] Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 10/31/2013. (CBL)
October 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs shall submit an amended complaint signed by both Randall and Amanda Burns no later than October 29, 2013. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Randall Burns shall submit, no later than October 29, 201 3, an affidavit stating the name of the administrator for the Estate of Nicole Burns, the names of its beneficiaries, and the names of its creditors. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that failure to comply with this Order may result in the dismissal of all or part of this action. (Response to Court due by 10/29/2013.) Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on October 9, 2013. (BRP)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burns, et al v. Carlson, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Linn, Missouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tracy Carlson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Brookfield, Missouri
Represented By: Christopher P. Rackers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randall E. Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?