McGee v. Kurth
Plaintiff: Jimmie Tyrone McGee
Defendant: Brook Kurth
Case Number: 2:2014cv00014
Filed: January 24, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: Hannibal Office
County: Pike
Presiding Judge: Catherine D. Perry
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. (See Full Order.) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendant's motion for summary judgment [# 24 ] is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to appoint counsel [# 38 ] is denied. A separate judgment in accord with this Memorandum and Order is entered today. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 11/9/2015. (CBL)
November 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 15 MOTION to Compel filed by Plaintiff Jimmie Tyrone McGee, 13 PRO SE MOTION Temporary Restraining Order Without Notice filed by Plaintiff Jimmie Tyrone McGee, 14 MOTION to Compel filed by Plaintiff Jimmie Tyrone McGee. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for a temporary restraining order 13 is denied. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff's motions to compel 14 and 15 are denied. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on November 19, 2014. (MCB)
March 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. (see order for details) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis [Doc. # 2 ] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall issue process or cause process to be issued up on the complaint as to Brook Kurth in his individual capacity. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff shall pay an initial partial filing fee of $20.82 within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if plaintiff fa ils to pay the initial partial filing fee within thirty (30) days, without first showing good cause, the Court will dismiss this action without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, pursuant to 42 U.S.C. § 1997e(g)(2), defendant shall reply to the complaint within the time provided by the applicable provisions of Rule 12(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, pursuant to the Court's differentiated case management system, this case is assigned to Track 5B (standard prisoner actions). Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 03/11/2014. (CBL)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McGee v. Kurth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jimmie Tyrone McGee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brook Kurth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?