Johnson v. Minor et al
Plaintiff: |
Luther W. Johnson, Jr. |
Defendant: |
Lee Ann Barry and Maxie Schrupf |
Case Number: |
2:2014cv00059 |
Filed: |
June 2, 2014 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri |
Office: |
Hannibal Office |
County: |
Cooper |
Presiding Judge: |
Henry Edward Autrey |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
March 1, 2016 |
Filing
56
OPINION MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants' motion for summary judgment [Doc. No 41 ] is GRANTED. A separate judgment in accordance with this Opinion, Memorandum and Order is entered this same date. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 3/1/16. (KJS)
|
April 22, 2015 |
Filing
49
OPINION MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs motion for appointment of counsel [Doc. No. 33] is denied without prejudice. 33 Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 4/22/15. (CLA)
|
October 8, 2014 |
Filing
22
OPINION, MEMORANDUM AND ORDER : ORDERED that the Clerk shall issue process or cause process to issue on defendant Max Schroff at the address provided by counsel ex parte [ECF No. 14]. Service must be effectuated in accordance with Rule 4(e) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, as specified in the body of this Memorandum and Order.. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 10/8/14. (CEL)
|
June 12, 2014 |
Filing
4
OPINION, MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis [ECF No. 2 ] is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that the plaintiff shall pay an initial filing fee of $17 within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. Plaintiff is instructed to make his remittance payable to "Clerk, United States District Court," and to include upon it: (1) his name; (2) his prison registration number; (3) the case number; and (4) that the remittance is for an original proceeding. FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall issue process or cause process to issue as to defendants Lee Ann Barry and Maxie Schrupf. FURTHER ORDERED that defendant Dean Minor is DISMISSED from this action without prejudice. A Partial Order of Dismissal will be filed with this Memorandum and Order. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 06/12/2014. (CLK)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?