Wilson v. Lombardi et al
Plaintiff: Patrick Wilson
Defendant: George A. Lombardi, Corizon, LLC, Geeneen A. Wilhite, Bonnie Boley, Paul Jones, J. Cofield and G. Babich
Case Number: 2:2015cv00045
Filed: June 22, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: Hannibal Office
County: Randolph
Presiding Judge: Catherine D. Perry
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 66 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Case Management Order (ECF #60) and Order Referring Case to Alternative Dispute Resolution (ECF #61), and all the deadlines and schedules contained therein, are VACATED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that , not later than March 6, 2017, the personal representative of Patrick Wilsons estate, if any, shall move for substitution of the proper party under Fed. R. Civ. P. 25(a)(1). Failure to timely file a motion for substitution shall result in the dism issal of this action without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that attorneys John M. Simon and Anthony G. Simon shall serve this Memorandum and Order upon any known survivors or heirs of Patrick Wilson, after which they are granted leave to withdraw as appointed counsel and shall no longer be considered as counsel of record. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this action is STAYED for ninety (90) days pending resolution of the status of the claim. Response to Court due by 3/6/2017. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on December 15, 2016. (MCB)
April 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 49 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. (See Full Order.) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendant Daryl Taylor and Lyle Taylor's Motion to Dismiss 37 is denied. Defendants are reminded of their obligation to answer plaintiff's First Amended Complaint within the time set by the rules. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 4/25/2016. (CBL)
November 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER (See Full Order) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff shall file an amended complaint on or before December 4, 2015. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendants motion to dismiss [Doc. # 16 ] is DENIED as moot, without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 11/03/15. (EAB)
August 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. (See Full Order.) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis [Doc. # 2 ] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall issue process or cause process to be issued on the complaint as to all named defendants in both their individual and official capacities. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff shall pay an initial partial filing fee of $51.62 within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, pursuant to the Court's differentiated case management system, this case is assigned to Track 5B (standard prisoner actions). Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 8/20/2015. (CBL)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilson v. Lombardi et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George A. Lombardi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corizon, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geeneen A. Wilhite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bonnie Boley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Cofield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G. Babich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?