Smalley v. Minor
Plaintiff: James Smalley
Defendant: Dean Minor
Case Number: 2:2016cv00069
Filed: October 3, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: Hannibal Office
County: Pike
Presiding Judge: Catherine D. Perry
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal [ECF No. 21] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff must pay an initial filing fee of $1.70 within thirty (30) days of th e date of this Order. Plaintiff is instructed to make his remittance payable to "Clerk, United States District Court," and to include upon it: (1) his name; (2) his prison registration number; (3) the case number; and (4) that the remittance is for an original proceeding. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on April 19, 2018. (MCB)
September 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER (See Full Order) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that motion to reopen case 9 is denied. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 9/8/17. (EAB)
November 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. (See Full Order.) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis [ECF No. 2 ] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the plaintiff must pay an initial filing fee of $2.00 within twenty-on e (21) days of the date of this Order. Plaintiff is instructed to make his remittance payable to "Clerk, United States District Court," and to include upon it: (1) his name; (2) his prison registration number; (3) the case number; and (4) that the remittance is for an original proceeding. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk is directed to send plaintiff a prisoner civil complaint form. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff must file an amended complaint, in accordance with the Cour t's instructions, no later than twenty-one (21) days from the date of this Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if plaintiff fails to comply with this Order, this action will be dismissed without further proceedings. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 11/18/2016. (Order and §1983 form package sent to plaintiff this date.) (CBL)
October 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. (See Full Order.) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order, plaintiff must submit a copy of his prison trust account statement for the six-month period before the filing of the complaint. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 10/11/2016. (CBL)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smalley v. Minor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Smalley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dean Minor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?