Wilson v. Stevenson
Plaintiff: Marc Wilson
Defendant: Jayna Stevenson
Case Number: 2:2017cv00004
Filed: January 19, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: Hannibal Office
County: Pike
Presiding Judge: Henry Edward Autrey
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 37 OPINION MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendant Jayna Stevensons Motion to Dismiss (Docket No. 28 ) is GRANTED to the extent defendant seeks dismissal of this case due to lack of subject matter jurisdiction. IT IS FURTHER ORDERE D that this case is DISMISSED without prejudice due to lack of jurisdiction. A separate order of dismissal will be entered herewith. IT IS HEREBY CERTIFIED that an appeal from this dismissal would not be taken in good faith. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 10/23/18. (KJS)
September 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 OPINION, MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, within thirty (30) days of the date of this Memorandum and Order, plaintiff shall show, by a preponderance of the evidence, that the amount in controversy alleged in the complaint is greater than the jurisdictional amount. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, within thirty (30) days of the date of this Memorandum and Order, plaintiff shall provide information to the Court concerning the state of his legal residence immediately preceding his present incarceration, and what events or omissions giving rise to the claims asserted in the complaint occurred in this judicial district. Response to Court due by 10/13/2018.. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 09/13/2018. (AAS)
March 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 OPINION MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs motion to proceed in forma pauperis (Docket No. 2) is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff must pay an initial partial filing fee of $25.17 within twenty-one (21) days of the date of this Order. Plaintiff is instructed to make hisremittance payable to Clerk, United States District Court, and to include upon it: (1) his name; (2) his prison registration number; (3) this case number; and (4) the statement that the remi ttance is for an original proceeding. Plaintiffs failure to timely comply with this Order may result in the dismissal of this action without notice and without further proceedings. 2 Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 3/3/17. (CLA)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilson v. Stevenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marc Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jayna Stevenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?