Mongler v. Knight et al
Plaintiff: Robert Mongler
Defendant: Brian Knight, Michael Loprieno, Ty Kirkpatrick, Capgain Properties, Inc., Capgain Holdings, Inc., Strategic Lending Solutions, LLC, LOP Capital LLC and Consulting Direct, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2017cv00006
Filed: January 31, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: Hannibal Office
County: Randolph
Presiding Judge: Catherine D. Perry
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 60 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendants' motion for leave to file a summary judgment motion 57 is denied. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the default judgment motion remains under submission and will be taken with the case as set out above. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on February 16, 2018. (MCB)
August 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 50 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. (See Full Order.) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motion for clerk's default 45 and the motion to reconsider 48 are denied. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the answer filed on July 28, 2017 is deemed timely filed with leave of Court. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 8/2/2017. (CBL)
July 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. (See Full Order.) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendants' motion to dismiss 17 is granted in part and denied in part; this case is dismissed without prejudice as to defendants Brian Knight and Strategic Lending Solutio ns, LLC., but it will proceed against the non-defaulting defendants Michael Lopriano, CapGain Properties, Inc. and LOP Capital, LLC. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all other pending motions [ 22 , 32 , 33 ] are denied. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that def endants CapGain Properties, Inc. and LOP Capital, LLC must file Disclosures of Organizational Interests as required by Local Rule 3-2.09 within seven days of the date of this order. A Case Management Order is entered separately this same date. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 7/10/2017. (CBL)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mongler v. Knight et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Mongler
Represented By: Donald J. Schutz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Knight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Loprieno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ty Kirkpatrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capgain Properties, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capgain Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Strategic Lending Solutions, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LOP Capital LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Consulting Direct, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?