Endicott et al v. Allen et al
Plaintiff: Franklin G. Endicott and Craig Dawdy
Defendant: Larry Allen, Troy Bartley, Frank Campbell, Travis Case, Alan Earls, Sandy Everheart, Catherine Flock, Chantay Godert, Richard Griggs, James Hurley, William Jones, Gil Long, Shelly Orf, Murry Phillips, Anne Precythe, Melvina Richardson, Ron White, Debbie Williams and Missouri Department of Corrections
Case Number: 2:2017cv00029
Filed: May 17, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: Hannibal Office
County: Pike
Presiding Judge: David D. Noce
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HERBY ORDERED that defendants Larry Allen, Troy Bartley, Frank Campbell, Travis Case, Alan Earls, Sandra Everhart, Catherine Flock, Chantay Godert, Richard Griggs, James Hurley, William Jones, Gil Long, Murray Philli ps, Anne Precythe, Melvina Richardson, Ronald White, and Debra Williams' motion to dismiss is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. The motion is GRANTED on the grounds of Eleventh Amendment immunity to the extent that the state official defend ants are named in their official capacities for liability for monetary damages, and DENIED without prejudice in all other respects. [ECF No. 30 ] IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to appoint counsel is DENIED without prejudice. [ ECF No. 31 ] IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for a preliminary injunction is DENIED. [ECF No. 33 ] IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for a hearing is DENIED as moot. [ECF No. 34 ] An Order of Partial Dismissal will accompany this Memorandum and Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge David D. Noce on 2/7/2019. (CLO)
December 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 OPINION, MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion requesting class certification and appointment of counsel is DENIED in part and DENIED without prejudice in part. The motion is denied as to plaintiff's request for class certification; the motion is denied without prejudice as to plaintiff's motion to appoint counsel. [ECF No. 6 ] Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 12/21/17. (KXS)
July 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff must file a second amended complaint no later than August 16, 2017. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff must pay an initial filing fee of $16.00 no later than August 16, 2017. Plaintif f is instructed to make his remittance payable to "Clerk, United States District Court," and to include upon it: (1) his name; (2) his prison registration number; (3) the case number; and ( 4) that the remittance is for an original proce eding. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the motion of Craig Dawdy for leave to proceed in forma pauperis is DENIED as moot. If plaintiff does not comply with this Order, the Court will dismiss this action without further proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge David D. Noce on 7/27/2017. (CLO)
July 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 OPINION MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk is directed to STRIKE plaintiff Craig Dawdy from this action. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk is directed to open a new case for Dawdy, utilizing the amended complaint (Doc. [9 ]) in the above-captioned case. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk is directed to file Dawdys motion to proceed in forma pauperis (Doc. 4 ) and certified inmate account statement (Doc. 5 ) in the new action. (Craig Dawdy terminated.) Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 7/25/17. (KJS)
May 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis [ECF No. 2 ] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk is directed to mail to plaintiff a copy of the Court's pri soner civil rights complaint form. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff must file an amended complaint on the Court's form within twenty-one (21) days of the date of this Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if plaintiff fails to comply with this Order, theCourt will dismiss this action without prejudice. If the case is dismissed for non-compliance with this Order, the dismissal will not count as a "strike" under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g). ( Response to Court due by 6/16/2017.) (Order and form mailed to F. Endicott). Signed by Magistrate Judge David D. Noce on 5/26/17. (KKS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Endicott et al v. Allen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Franklin G. Endicott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craig Dawdy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Troy Bartley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travis Case
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alan Earls
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandy Everheart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catherine Flock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chantay Godert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Griggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Hurley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gil Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shelly Orf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Murry Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anne Precythe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melvina Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debbie Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Missouri Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?