Cross v. Berryhill

Plaintiff: Charles Dale Cross
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Interested Party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Case Number: 2:2018cv00067
Filed: July 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: Hannibal Office
County: Macon
Presiding Judge: David D Noce
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2018 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Charles Dale Cross. (CLO)
September 14, 2018 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Charles Dale Cross. Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill served on 8/13/2018, answer due 10/12/2018. (CLO)
September 4, 2018 Filing 10 FULL CONSENT has been received by Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill, Plaintiff Charles Dale Cross. (JAB)
August 30, 2018 Filing 9 MARSHAL Return Executed party served United States Attorney ED/MO, Type of return Summons/Complaint. (CLO)
August 24, 2018 Filing 8 Letter from Clerk sent to Plaintiff Charles Dale Cross re: Failure to file Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. (JAB)
August 8, 2018 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by Jane Rund for Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (Rund, Jane)
July 31, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to defendant Nancy A. Berryhill, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. The summons was hand delivered to USMS. (Attachments: #1 Summons US Atty Gen, #2 Summons US Atty)(KKS)
July 30, 2018 Filing 5 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW)
July 30, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 3,4. Mailed to party not set up for electronic notification. Mon Jul 30 15:52:46 CDT 2018 (Stamm, Katie)
July 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis [#2] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall issue process or cause process to issue on the complaint.. Signed by Magistrate Judge David D. Noce on 7/30/18. (KKS)
July 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER - TRACK 4: SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL. Signed by Magistrate Judge David D. Noce on 7/30/18. (KKS)
July 30, 2018 ***Complaint Letter Processed (see notice of electronic filing for distribution list) Mon Jul 30 10:00:38 CDT 2018 (admin,)
July 30, 2018 ***Complaint Letter Created. This is to advise you that this office has received and filed your complaint and has assigned it the above-referenced case number. (JWD)
July 30, 2018 Case Opening Notification: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Judge Assigned: Honorable David D. Noce. (JWD)
July 27, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Charles Dale Cross. (JWD)
July 27, 2018 Filing 1 Social Security COMPLAINT, Non-Jury Demand, filed by Charles Dale Cross. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Appeals Council Action [sealed pursuant to Local Rule 2.17 because it contains personal identifiers], #2 Civil Cover Sheet - unsigned, #3 Original Filing Form, #4 Envelope)(JWD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cross v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Dale Cross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Represented By: Jane Rund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?