Earnest v. Berryhill

Plaintiff: trudy r earnest and Trudy R. Earnest
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security and Nancy A. Berryhill
Interested Party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Case Number: 2:2018cv00070
Filed: July 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: Hannibal Office
County: Marion
Presiding Judge: Audrey G Fleissig
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:416
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2018 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to USAG filed by Trudy R. Earnest. (KJS)
September 17, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Berryhill filed by Trudy R. Earnest. (KJS)
August 31, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Trudy R. Earnest. Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill served on 8/2/2018, answer due 10/1/2018. (KCB)
August 8, 2018 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by Jane Rund for Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (Rund, Jane)
July 31, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to defendant Nancy A. Berryhill, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. The summons was hand delivered to USMS. (KCB)
July 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis #2 is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall issue process or cause process to issue on the complaint. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 07/31/2018. (KCB)
July 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER This case is assigned to Track: four [SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS]. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 07/31/2018. (KCB)
July 31, 2018 Case Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: Honorable Audrey G. Fleissig. (MFG)
July 30, 2018 Filing 3 FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT - CJA 23 by Plaintiff Trudy R. Earnest. (MFG)
July 30, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff trudy r earnest. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Financial Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order Order for Leave to Proceed IFP)(Dempsey, Vicki)
July 30, 2018 Filing 1 Social Security COMPLAINT Non-Jury Demand,Yes or No - Yes,, filed by trudy r earnest. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form Original Filing Form, #3 Summons Summons, #4 Summons Summons, #5 Summons Summons, #6 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Dempsey, Vicki)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Earnest v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: trudy r earnest
Represented By: Vicki A. Dempsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trudy R. Earnest
Represented By: Vicki A. Dempsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Represented By: Jane Rund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?