Ward v. Stamps et al
Plaintiff: James Robert Ward, Sr.
Defendant: Maurita Jenness, Jane Doe, Corizon Medical Health Care System, Ruanne Stamps and Rhonda Burgess
Case Number: 2:2018cv00113
Filed: December 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Abbie Crites-Leoni
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2019 Receipt 4644077665 in the amount of $16.12 for PLRA CIVIL FILING FEE on behalf of Ward, James Robert (CCAM)
February 1, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION for Reconsideration re #13 Order of Dismissal, #12 Memorandum & Order, by Plaintiff James Robert Ward, Sr. (CSG)
January 31, 2019 Filing 18 Letter to Mr. Linhares from James R. Ward. (Copy of document #3 sent to Mr. Ward along with blank 1983 prisoner civil rights packet.) (CSG)
January 28, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Change of Address of Corizon Medical Services by Plaintiff James Robert Ward, Sr. (CSG) Address updated on 1/29/2019 (CMC).
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 12-14. Fri Jan 18 15:56:11 CST 2019 (Shirley, Kelley)
January 18, 2019 Filing 14 Letter from Clerk sent to pro-se prisoner re:FRAP - all procedures for filing Notice of Appeal (copy of motion to proceed IFP on appeal attached and mailed) (KJS)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER OF DISMISSAL - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this case is DISMISSED without prejudice. IT IS HEREBY CERTIFIED that an appeal from this dismissal would not be taken in good faith. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 1/18/19. (KJS)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 OPINION MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs motion to proceed in forma pauperis (Docket No. 2) is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff must pay an initial filing fee of $16.12 within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. Plaintiff is instructed to make his remittance payable to Clerk, United States District Court, and to include upon it: (1) his name; (2) his prison registration number; (3) the case number; and (4) the statement that the remittance is for an original proceeding. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs motion for an extension of time to file a certified account statement (Docket No. #7 ) is DENIED as moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this case is DISMISSED without prejudice. A separate order of dismissal will be entered herewith. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs Motion to Appoint Counsel (Docket No. #4 ) and his Amended Motion to Appoint Counsel (Docket No. #6 ) are DENIED as moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs Motion to Produce (Docket No. #8 ) is DENIED as moot. IT IS HEREBY CERTIFIED that an appeal from this dismissal would not be taken in good faith. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 1/18/19. (KJS)
January 17, 2019 Filing 16 Certified Inmate Account Statement by Plaintiff James Robert Ward, Sr. (CSG)
January 17, 2019 Filing 15 Continued Request to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by Plaintiff James Robert Ward, Sr. (CSG)
January 14, 2019 Filing 11 Continued Request for #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis under 42:1983 (prisoner), #4 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Plaintiff James Robert Ward, Sr. (CSG)
January 10, 2019 Filing 10 SUPPLEMENTAL re #1 Complaint by Plaintiff James Robert Ward, Sr. (CSG) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/15/2019: #1 Letter and Envelope) (CSG).
January 10, 2019 Filing 9 Continued Request for #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis under 42:1983 (prisoner) by Plaintiff James Robert Ward, Sr. Account Statement has been requested. (CSG)
January 7, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Produce by Plaintiff James Robert Ward, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Declarations)(CSG)
January 7, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of: Time to File Account Statement by Plaintiff James Robert Ward, Sr. (CSG)
January 2, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Plaintiff James Robert Ward, Sr. (CSG) Modified on 1/4/2019 (CSG).
December 20, 2018 ***Complaint Letter Processed (see notice of electronic filing for distribution list) Thu Dec 20 13:25:59 CST 2018 (admin,)
December 18, 2018 Filing 5 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW)
December 18, 2018 ***Complaint Letter Created. This is to advise you that this office has received and filed your complaint and has assigned it the above-referenced case number. (JWD)
December 18, 2018 Case Opening Notification: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Judge Assigned: Honorable Abbie S. Crites-Leoni. (JWD)
December 12, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Plaintiff James Robert Ward, Sr. (JWD)
December 12, 2018 Filing 3 Non-Certified Inmate Account Statement by Plaintiff James Robert Ward, Sr. (JWD)
December 12, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis under 42:1983 (prisoner) by Plaintiff James Robert Ward, Sr. (JWD) (Main Document 2 replaced on 1/4/2019) (CSG).
December 12, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant Corizon Medical Health Care System, Jane Doe, Maurita Jenness, Ruanne Stamps, Jury Demand, filed by James Robert Ward, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Original Filing Form, #2 Envelope)(JWD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ward v. Stamps et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maurita Jenness
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corizon Medical Health Care System
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruanne Stamps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhonda Burgess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Robert Ward, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?