Ryherd v. Berryhill
Plaintiff: Kara Lynn Ryherd
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Interested Party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Case Number: 2:2018cv00116
Filed: December 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Shirley Padmore Mensah
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:206
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2019 Filing 11 ENTRY of Appearance by Nicholas P. Llewellyn for Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (Llewellyn, Nicholas)
January 25, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Kara Lynn Ryherd. United States Attorney General served. (KEK)
January 25, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Kara Lynn Ryherd. Office of Regional Chief Counsel served. (KEK)
January 22, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Kara Lynn Ryherd. Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill served on 1/18/2019, answer due 3/19/2019. Party Jeff Jenson served. (KEK)
December 27, 2018 Summons Issued as to defendant Nancy A. Berryhill, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. The summons were hand delivered to USM. (ARL)
December 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER This case is assigned to Track: 4. This case has been randomly assigned to a United States Magistrate Judge. The parties have twenty-one (21) days from their entry of appearance to file their Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction forms. Pursuant to 12(a)(3) and (4), Fed.R.Civ.P., defendant must file any motion to dismiss, motion to remand, and/or answer within sixty (60) days of service of plaintiff's complaint. Along with its answer defendant shall file a transcript of the record, in accordance with 42 U.S.C. 405(g). See Order for full details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shirley Padmore Mensah on 12/26/18. (ARL)
December 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER re #2 IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis [#2] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall issue process or cause process to issue on the complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shirley Padmore Mensah on 12/26/18. (ARL)
December 21, 2018 Filing 5 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW)
December 21, 2018 Amended Case Opening Notification: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Judge Assigned: Honorable Shirley P. Mensah. (MFG)
December 21, 2018 Filing 4 CLERK'S ORDER (GJL)..The above styled and numbered case was opened on December 19, 2018 and assigned to the Eastern Division. After a review of the case, it was determined the case was assigned incorrectly. The case should have been assigned to the Northern Division. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the above styled case is transferred to the Northern Division and randomly assigned to the Honorable Shirley Padmore Mensah, United States Magistrate Judge, under cause number 2:18-cv-00116-SPM. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that cause number 4:18-cv-02112-AGF be administratively closed. (MFG)
December 21, 2018 Case Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: Honorable Audrey G. Fleissig. (MFG)
December 20, 2018 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff Kara Lynn Ryherd. Parent companies: none, Subsidiaries: none, Publicly held company: none,. (Dean, Mark)
December 20, 2018 Filing 2 First MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Plaintiff Kara Lynn Ryherd. (Dean, Mark)
December 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant Nancy A. Berryhill Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Kara Lynn Ryherd. (Attachments: #1 Original Filing Form Filing Form, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet)(Dean, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ryherd v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Represented By: Nicholas P. Llewellyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kara Lynn Ryherd
Represented By: Mark J. Dean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?