A.T. Still University of Health Sciences v. Sportswear Inc.

Plaintiff: A.T. Still University of Health Sciences
Defendant: Sportswear Inc., d/b/a Prep Sportswear and Sportswear Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00036
Filed: April 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: John M Bodenhausen
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2019 NOTICE: IF YOU HAVE ALREADY UPGRADED YOUR PACER ACCOUNT YOU CAN DISREGARD THIS NOTICE. IF YOU DO NOT UPGRADE YOU WILL NOT BE ABLE TO FILE IN THE SYSTEM AFTER MAY 31, 2019. PLEASE UPGRADE IMMEDIATELY. If you are using a shared account to file cases, you will need to create an individual account; instructions can be found at:#https://www.moed.uscourts.gov/sites/moed/files/Register-for-New-PACER-account.pdf. If you already have an individual account, it will need to be upgraded; instructions can be found #https://www.moed.uscourts.gov/sites/moed/files/Upgrade-Current-PACER-Account.pdf. If you need further assistance contact the MOED CM/ECF Help Desk at 314-244-7650 or #moedml_cmecf_help@moed.uscourts.gov. (CSAW)
May 10, 2019 Summons Issued as to defendant Sportswear Inc.. The summons was emailed to attorney Keith J. Grady. (BAK)
May 10, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff A.T. Still University of Health Sciences Process Server: HPS Process Service & Investigations (Attachments: #1 Summons)(BAK)
May 2, 2019 Filing 3 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW)
May 2, 2019 Case Opening Notification: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. and all non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: U.S. Magistrate Judge John M. Bodenhausen. Court to issue service when proper documents are filed. (BAK)
April 30, 2019 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff A.T. Still University of Health Sciences. Parent companies: None, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: N/A,. (Grady, Keith)
April 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR FEDERAL TRADEMARK INFRINGEMENT UNDER 15 U.S.C. 1114, FEDERAL UNFAIR COMPETITION AND FALSE DESIGNATION OF ORIGIN UNDER 15 U.S.C. 1125(A), AND COMMON LAW TRADEMARK INFRINGEMENT AND UNFAIR COMPETITION against defendant Sportswear Inc., d/b/a Prep Sportswear with receipt number 0865-7182122, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by A.T. Still University of Health Sciences. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Original Filing Form , #7 Civil Cover Sheet )(Grady, Keith)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: A.T. Still University of Health Sciences v. Sportswear Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sportswear Inc., d/b/a Prep Sportswear
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sportswear Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A.T. Still University of Health Sciences
Represented By: Keith J. Grady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?