Fogle v. Berryhill
Plaintiff: Kimberly M. Fogle
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Interested Party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Case Number: 2:2019cv00039
Filed: May 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: Hannibal Office
Presiding Judge: Nannette A Baker
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Kimberly M. Fogle. (CLA)
June 12, 2019 Filing 10 FULL CONSENT has been received by Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill, Plaintiff Kimberly M. Fogle. (AAS)
June 12, 2019 Filing 9 ENTRY of Appearance by Jane Rund for Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (Rund, Jane)
June 6, 2019 Filing 8 Corrected Summons Issued as to defendant Nancy A. Berryhill, SSA Office of General Counsel. The summons was hand delivered to USMS. (Case number was incorrect on previous summons issued) (AAS)
May 22, 2019 Filing 7 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW)
May 22, 2019 Summons Issued as to defendant Nancy A. Berryhill, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. The summons was hand delivered to USM. (CLA)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER This case is assigned to Track: administrative. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker on 5/22/19. (Attachments: #1 consent)(CLA)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis [#2] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall issue process or cause process to issue on the complaint. #2 Signed by Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker on 5/22/19. (CLA)
May 17, 2019 Case Opening Notification: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Judge Assigned: U.S. Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker. (BAK)
May 17, 2019 Filing 4 CLERK'S ORDER (GJL) - Due to electronic case opening, the above numbered case was inadvertently opened in error. Therefore, this case will be administratively closed. The new case number in the Northern Division is 2:19cv39 NAB. (BAK)
May 16, 2019 Filing 3 FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT - CJA 23 by Plaintiff Kimberly M. Fogle. (Camp, David)
May 16, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Kimberly M. Fogle. (Camp, David)
May 16, 2019 Filing 1 Social Security COMPLAINT Non-Jury Demand,Yes or No - Yes,, filed by Kimberly M. Fogle. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Original Filing Form)(Camp, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fogle v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly M. Fogle
Represented By: David D. Camp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Represented By: Jane Rund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?