Brown v. Berryhill
Plaintiff: Brenda L Brown and Brenda L. Brown
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security and Nancy A. Berryhill
Interested Party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Case Number: 2:2019cv00042
Filed: June 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Abbie Crites-Leoni
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 416
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Attorney General filed by Brenda L. Brown. (JAB)
July 3, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Nancy Berryhill filed by Brenda L. Brown. (JAB)
June 26, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill served on 6/17/2019 thru Us Attorney, answer due 8/16/2019. (MRS)
June 18, 2019 Filing 8 FULL CONSENT has been received by Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill, Plaintiff Brenda L. Brown. Consent to Magistrate Judge, Consent to Magistrate Judge (MRS)
June 18, 2019 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by Jane Rund for Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (Rund, Jane)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER This case is assigned to Track: 4 Social Security. This case has been randomly assigned to a United States Magistrate Judge. The parties have twenty-one (21) days from their entry of appearance to file their Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction forms. Pursuant to 12(a)(3) and (4), Fed.R.Civ.P., defendant must file any motion to dismiss, motion to remand, and/or answer within sixty (60) days of service of plaintiff's complaint. Along with its answer defendant shall file a transcript of the record, in accordance with 42 U.S.C. 405(g).Pursuant to E.D.Mo.L.R. 9.02, plaintiff must, unless otherwise ordered by the Court, serve and file a brief within thirty (30) days after the Commissioner's service of an answer and the administrative transcript. The Commissioner must serve and file a brief within thirty (30) days after the service of the plaintiff's brief. Plaintiff shall have fourteen (14) days after service of the Commissioner's brief to file a reply brief. No further briefs shall be filed except by leave of court upon a showing of good cause. A brief filed pursuant to E.D.Mo.L.R. 9.02 shall not exceed fifteen (15) standard typed pages, exclusive of a signature page and attachments, without leave of court. A reply brief shall not exceed ten (10) pages. Signed by Magistrate Judge Abbie Crites-Leoni on 6/6/2019. (JMC)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall issue process or cause process to issue on the complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Abbie Crites-Leoni on 6/6/2019. (JMC)
June 6, 2019 Summonses Issued as to defendants Nancy A. Berryhill, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. The summonses were mailed to U.S. Marshal's Office in St. Louis. (JMC)
June 5, 2019 Filing 4 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (Aubuchon, Brian)
June 4, 2019 Case Opening Notification: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Judge Assigned: Honorable Abbie S. Crites-Leoni. (MFG)
June 3, 2019 Filing 3 FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT - CJA 23 by Plaintiff Brenda L. Brown. (MFG)
June 3, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Brenda L Brown. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Financial Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order Order for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis)(Dempsey, Vicki)
June 3, 2019 Filing 1 Social Security COMPLAINT Non-Jury Demand,Yes or No - Yes,, filed by Brenda L Brown. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form Original Filing Form, #3 Summons Summons, #4 Summons Summons, #5 Summons Summons, #6 Exhibit Exhibit A, #7 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Dempsey, Vicki)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Represented By: Jane Rund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda L Brown
Represented By: Vicki A. Dempsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda L. Brown
Represented By: Vicki A. Dempsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?