Wallace v. Saul
Plaintiff: Rita A. Wallace
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Interested Party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Case Number: 2:2019cv00046
Filed: June 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Rodney W Sippel
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Rita A. Wallace. William Barr served. (KEK)
July 3, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Rita A. Wallace. Andrew M. Saul served. (KEK)
June 24, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Rita A. Wallace. Defendant Andrew M. Saul served on 6/18/2019, answer due 8/19/2019. (NEP)
June 19, 2019 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Nicholas P. Llewellyn for Defendant Andrew M. Saul. (Llewellyn, Nicholas)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER - TRACK 4: SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL. [SEE ORDER FOR FULL DETAILS] Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 6/14/19. (KEK)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis #2 is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall issue process or cause process to issue on the complaint. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 6/14/19. (KEK)
June 14, 2019 Summons Issued as to defendant All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. The summons was hand delivered to USMS. (KEK)
June 12, 2019 Filing 3 FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT - CJA 23 by Plaintiff Rita A. Wallace. (BAK)
June 12, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Rita A. Wallace. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Bill, Karen)
June 12, 2019 Filing 1 Social Security COMPLAINT Non-Jury Demand,Yes or No - Yes,, filed by Rita A. Wallace. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Bill, Karen)
June 12, 2019 Case Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Rodney W. Sippel. (BAK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wallace v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Represented By: Nicholas P. Llewellyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rita A. Wallace
Represented By: Karen Kraus Bill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?