Lewis County Rural Electric Cooperative v. International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, Local Union No. 2
Defendant: International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, Local Union No. 2
Petitioner: Lewis County Rural Electric Cooperative
Case Number: 2:2019cv00079
Filed: October 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: David D Noce
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 09:0010
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2019 Filing 9 FULL CONSENT has been received by Defendant International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, Local Union No. 2, Petitioner Lewis County Rural Electric Cooperative. (CLO)
November 26, 2019 Filing 8 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, Local Union No. 2. Parent companies: None, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Hansen, Amanda)
November 26, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM to Enforce Arbitration Award against plaintiff Lewis County Rural Electric Cooperative by International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, Local Union No. 2. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Hansen, Amanda)
October 10, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Lewis County Rural Electric Cooperative International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, Local Union No. 2 waiver signed on 10/4/2019, answer due 12/3/2019. (Temple, Rick)
October 4, 2019 Filing 5 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW)
October 4, 2019 Case Opening Notification: Waivers issued 1. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. and all non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: U.S. Magistrate Judge David D. Noce. (BAK)
October 4, 2019 Filing 4 Waiver of Service Issued filed by Lewis County Rural Electric Cooperative as to International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, Local Union No. 2. (Attachments: #1 Waiver of Service )(Temple, Rick) Modified on 10/4/2019 (BAK).
October 3, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Rick E. Temple. Verified Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-7499051) by Petitioner Lewis County Rural Electric Cooperative. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing Certificate of Good Standing)(Temple, Rick)
October 3, 2019 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Petitioner Lewis County Rural Electric Cooperative.. (Temple, Rick)
October 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Motion to Vacate Arbitration Award) against defendant International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, Local Union No. 2 with receipt number AMOEDC-7498641, in the amount of $400 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Lewis County Rural Electric Cooperative. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Arbitration Award, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Original Filing Form, #4 Summons)(Temple, Rick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lewis County Rural Electric Cooperative v. International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, Local Union No. 2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, Local Union No. 2
Represented By: Amanda K. Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Lewis County Rural Electric Cooperative
Represented By: Rick E. Temple
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?