Nottingham v. Saul
Plaintiff: Nottingham, Randal A Nottingham and Randal A. Nottingham
Defendant: Saul and Andrew M. Saul
Interested Party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Case Number: 2:2020cv00014
Filed: March 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Catherine D Perry
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 416
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Randal A. Nottingham. Defendant Andrew M. Saul (U.S. Attorney) served on 3/30/2020, answer due 5/29/2020. (TMT)
April 1, 2020 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Nicholas P. Llewellyn for Defendant Andrew M. Saul. (Llewellyn, Nicholas)
March 18, 2020 Summons Issued as to defendant Andrew M. Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. The summons was hand delivered to USMS. (TMT)
March 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: This case is assigned to Track: Track 4 (Administrative) [SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS] Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 3/17/2020. (TMT)
March 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis [#2] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall issue process or cause process to issue on the complaint. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 3/17/2020. (TMT)
March 16, 2020 Filing 3 FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT - CJA 23 by Plaintiff Randal A Nottingham. (BAK)
March 16, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Randal A Nottingham. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Financial Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order Order to Proceed In Forma Pauperis)(Dempsey, Vicki)
March 16, 2020 Filing 1 Social Security COMPLAINT Non-Jury Demand,Yes or No - Yes,, filed by Randal A Nottingham. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet , #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6Exhibit A , #7 Exhibit B)(Dempsey, Vicki)
March 16, 2020 Case Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Catherine D. Perry. (BAK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nottingham v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nottingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randal A Nottingham
Represented By: Vicki A. Dempsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randal A. Nottingham
Represented By: Vicki A. Dempsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Represented By: Nicholas P. Llewellyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?