Tacker v. Saul
Plaintiff: Cynthia M. Tacker
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Interested Party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Case Number: 2:2020cv00059
Filed: September 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Shirley Padmore Mensah
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 27, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Cynthia M. Tacker. Andrew M. Saul served on 10/14/2020, answer due 12/9/2020. (Bill, Karen)
October 27, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Cynthia M. Tacker. Andrew M. Saul served on 10/13/2020, answer due 12/9/2020. (Bill, Karen)
October 27, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Cynthia M. Tacker. Defendant Andrew M. Saul served on 10/10/2020, answer due 12/9/2020. (Bill, Karen)
October 16, 2020 Filing 5 FULL CONSENT has been received by Defendant Andrew M. Saul, Plaintiff Cynthia M. Tacker. (EAB)
October 16, 2020 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Nicholas P. Llewellyn for Defendant Andrew M. Saul. (Llewellyn, Nicholas)
October 5, 2020 Filing 3 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (FLJ)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER - TRACK 4: SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the following provisions apply in this case, and will be modified only upon a showing of exceptional circumstances: This case has been assigned to Track 4 (Administrative). See Order For Full Details Notice re: Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction due by 10/21/2020.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shirley Padmore Mensah on 09/30/2020. (AAT)
September 30, 2020 Filing 1 Social Security COMPLAINT with receipt number AMOEDC-8181191, in the amount of $400 Non-Jury Demand,Yes or No - No,, filed by Cynthia M. Tacker. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Summons US Attorney, #4 Summons General Counsel, #5 Summons Attorney General)(Bill, Karen) Modified on 9/30/2020 to reflect that attachments 3-5 are Summons in a Civil Action (JWD).
September 30, 2020 Case Opening Notification: 3 Summons(es) issued. The summons was emailed to attorney Karen Kraus Bill. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Judge Assigned: Honorable Shirley P. Mensah. (JWD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tacker v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia M. Tacker
Represented By: Karen Kraus Bill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Represented By: Nicholas P. Llewellyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?