Chambers v. Saul
Plaintiff: Anthony Charles Eugene Chambers and Andrew M. Saul
Interested Party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Case Number: 2:2020cv00073
Filed: November 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Patricia L Cohen
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2020 Filing 10 SUPPLEMENTAL re #1 Complaint (Social Security) Original Filing Form by Plaintiff Anthony Charles Eugene Chambers. (Cundiff, Barry)
December 15, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Anthony Charles Eugene Chambers. Defendant Andrew M. Saul served on 12/11/2020, answer due 2/9/2021. (CLO)
December 15, 2020 Filing 8 FULL CONSENT has been received by Plaintiff Anthony Charles Eugene Chambers, Defendant Andrew M. Saul. (CLO)
December 15, 2020 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by Jane Rund for Defendant Andrew M. Saul. (Rund, Jane)
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER - TRACK 4: SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the following provisions apply in this case, and will be modified only upon a showing of exceptional circumstances: (SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS). This case is assigned to Track: 4. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Cohen on 12/4/2020. (CLO)
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis [ECF No. #2 ] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall issue process or cause process to issue on the complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Cohen on 12/4/2020. (CLO)
December 4, 2020 Summons Issued as to defendant Andrew M. Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. The summons was hand delivered to USMS. (CLO)
December 2, 2020 Filing 4 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (FLJ)
December 2, 2020 Case Opening Notification: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Judge Assigned: Honorable Patricia L. Cohen. (MFG)
November 30, 2020 Filing 3 FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT - CJA 23 by Plaintiff Anthony Charles Eugene Chambers. (MFG)
November 30, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Anthony Charles Eugene Chambers. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit re Financial Status)(Cundiff, Barry)
November 30, 2020 Filing 1 Social Security COMPLAINT Non-Jury Demand,Yes or No - Yes,, filed by Anthony Charles Eugene Chambers. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cundiff, Barry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chambers v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Charles Eugene Chambers
Represented By: Barry V. Cundiff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew M. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?