Ritrovato v. Saul
Plaintiff: Cheryl R. Ritrovato
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Interested Party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Case Number: 2:2021cv00003
Filed: January 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Rodney W Sippel
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Cheryl R. Ritrovato. US Attorney General served. (KEK)
February 12, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Cheryl R. Ritrovato. Social Security Administration Office of Regional Chief Counsel served. (KEK)
January 21, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Cheryl R. Ritrovato. Defendant Andrew M. Saul served on 1/14/2021, answer due 3/15/2021. US Attorney served. (KEK)
January 19, 2021 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Nicholas P. Llewellyn for Defendant Andrew M. Saul. (Llewellyn, Nicholas)
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the following provisions apply in this case, and will be modified only upon a showing of exceptional circumstances: This case is assigned to Track: 4... SEE ORDER FOR FULL DETAILS. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 01/12/2021. (ANP)
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis [#2] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall issue process or cause process to issue on the complaint. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 01/12/2021. (ANP)
January 12, 2021 Filing 3 FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT - CJA 23 by Plaintiff Cheryl R. Ritrovato. (BAK)
January 12, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Cheryl R. Ritrovato. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Bill, Karen)
January 12, 2021 Filing 1 Social Security COMPLAINT Non-Jury Demand,Yes or No - Yes,, filed by Cheryl R. Ritrovato. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Bill, Karen)
January 12, 2021 Case Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Rodney W. Sippel. (BAK)
January 12, 2021 Summons Issued as to defendant Andrew M. Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. The summons was hand delivered to USMS. (ANP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ritrovato v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheryl R. Ritrovato
Represented By: Karen Kraus Bill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Represented By: Nicholas P. Llewellyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?