Holt et al v. Scotland County Juvenile Office et al
Plaintiff: M.H., Bobbie Holt and Brad Holt
Defendant: A.A., Jenny Aldridge, Randall Aldridge, Jim Kigar and Scotland County Juvenile Office
Case Number: 2:2021cv00016
Filed: March 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Noelle C Collins
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 6, 2021 Filing 18 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Defendants Jim Kigar, Scotland County Juvenile Office. (Wang, Christal)
May 5, 2021 Filing 17 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants; Amendment to #1 Complaint filed by Brad Holt, M.H., Bobbie Holt. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by Bobbie Holt, Brad Holt.(Flaspohler, Frank) Modified on 5/6/2021 (TMT).
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall file either an amended complaint or responses to the motions to dismiss on or before May 6, 2021. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a)(1)(B). Signed by Magistrate Judge Noelle C. Collins on 4/16/2021. (TMT)
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant A.A.'s Motion for Appointment of Next Friend (Doc. #8 ) is GRANTED. Defendant A.A.'s grandmother, Malonda Robinson, is appointed as Next Friend for the minor defendant A.A. Signed by Magistrate Judge Noelle C. Collins on 4/16/2021. (KBL)
April 15, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Defendants Jenny Aldridge, Randall Aldridge. (Gannon, Katelyn)
April 15, 2021 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #12 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendants Jenny Aldridge, Randall Aldridge. (Gannon, Katelyn)
April 15, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss or in the alternative Motion for More Definite Statement by Defendants Jenny Aldridge, Randall Aldridge. (Gannon, Katelyn) Modified on 4/16/2021 (TMT).
April 14, 2021 Filing 11 ENTRY of Appearance by Katelyn Gannon for Defendants Jenny Aldridge, Randall Aldridge. (Gannon, Katelyn)
April 14, 2021 Filing 10 ENTRY of Appearance by Robert J. Wulff for Defendants Jenny Aldridge, Randall Aldridge. (Wulff, Robert)
April 14, 2021 Filing 9 ENTRY of Appearance by Donald Michael Bell for Defendant A.A.. (Bell, Donald)
April 14, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Appointment of Next Friend as to A.A. ; relationship to minor:Maternal Grandmother by Defendant A.A.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Consent to Serve as Next Friend for Defendant A.A., #2 Exhibit Proposed Order Appointing Next Friend for A.A.)(Sanner, Jon)
April 14, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Defendant A.A.. (Sanner, Jon)
April 14, 2021 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Jon R. Sanner for Defendant A.A.. (Sanner, Jon)
April 6, 2021 Notice from Clerk instructing Plaintiffs Bobbie Holt, Brad Holt, M.H. to submit Notice regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Notice re: Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction due by 4/13/2021. (KCD)
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff M.H.'s Motion for Appointment of Next Friend (Doc. #2 ) is GRANTED. Plaintiffs Brad and Bobbie Holt are appointed as Next Friend for the minor plaintiff M.H. Signed by Magistrate Judge Noelle C. Collins on 3/19/2021. (KBL)
March 15, 2021 Filing 4 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (FLJ)
March 15, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiffs Bobbie Holt, Brad Holt, M.H. Process Server: Gregory T. Lanham (Flaspohler, Frank)
March 15, 2021 Case Opening Notification: 5 Summons(es) issued. The summons were emailed to attorney Frank Robert Flaspohler. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Judge Assigned: U.S. Magistrate Judge Noelle C. Collins. (BAK)
March 12, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Appointment of Next Friend as to M.H. ; relationship to minor:Parents by Plaintiffs Bobbie Holt, Brad Holt. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(BAK)
March 12, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant All Defendants with receipt number AMOEDC-8528723, in the amount of $402 Jury Demand,, filed by Brad Holt, Bobbie Holt. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons, #3 Attachment Motion to Appoint Next Friend, #4 Attachment Order Appointing Next Friend)(Flaspohler, Frank) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/15/2021: #5 Original Filing Form) (BAK). Modified on 3/15/2021 (JWD). Clerk's note: complaint sealed pursuant to Local Rule 2.17 because it contains personal identifiers.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holt et al v. Scotland County Juvenile Office et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M.H.
Represented By: Frank Robert Flaspohler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobbie Holt
Represented By: Frank Robert Flaspohler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brad Holt
Represented By: Frank Robert Flaspohler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.A.
Represented By: Donald Michael Bell
Represented By: Jon R. Sanner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jenny Aldridge
Represented By: Robert J. Wulff
Represented By: Katelyn Gannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randall Aldridge
Represented By: Robert J. Wulff
Represented By: Katelyn Gannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Kigar
Represented By: Christal Marie Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scotland County Juvenile Office
Represented By: Christal Marie Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?