Fugate v. Moberly Police Department et al
Plaintiff: Marcus Wayne Fugate
Defendant: Moberly Police Department, John Doe 1, John Doe 2 and Unknown West
Case Number: 2:2021cv00062
Filed: October 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Stephen R Welby
Referring Judge: Ronnie L White
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 1, 2021 Filing 8 PRO SE MOTION FOR APPOINTING COUNSEL by Plaintiff Marcus Wayne Fugate. (JMP)
November 12, 2021 Filing 7 Certified Inmate Account Statement by Plaintiff Marcus Wayne Fugate. (JMP)
November 9, 2021 Filing 6 RETURN LETTER from clerk to Marcus Fugate re: Return of Documents (Attachments: #1 Attachment Returned Document) (TMT)
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 6. Tue Nov 9 10:52:57 CST 2021 (Tillman, Tiffani)
November 8, 2021 Filing 5 Certified Inmate Account Statement by Plaintiff Marcus Wayne Fugate. (Attachments: #1 Letter and Envelope)(TMT)
October 25, 2021 Filing 4 CJRA ORDER (GJL). Magistrate Judge Stephen R. Welby termed. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the above styled cause is randomly reassigned from Magistrate Judge Stephen R. Welby to District Judge Ronnie L. White. Case reassigned to District Judge Ronnie L. White and District Judge Ronnie L. White for all further proceedings (JMP)
October 25, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis under 42:1983 (prisoner) by Plaintiff Marcus Wayne Fugate. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Letter)(JMP)
October 7, 2021 Filing 2 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (Potter, Jacob)
October 7, 2021 Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: Honorable Stephen R. Welby. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. (JWD)
October 7, 2021 ***Complaint Letter Created. This is to advise you that this office has received and filed your complaint and has assigned it the above-referenced case number. (JWD)
October 7, 2021 ***Complaint Letter Processed (see notice of electronic filing for distribution list) Thu Oct 7 12:00:48 CDT 2021 (admin,)
October 6, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant John Doe 1, John Doe 2, Moberly Police Department, Unknown West, Jury Demand, filed by Marcus Wayne Fugate. (Attachments: #1 Correspondence, #2 Envelope)(JWD) Modified on 10/7/2021 to correct filing date (JWD).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fugate v. Moberly Police Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcus Wayne Fugate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moberly Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?