Otte et al v. Randolph County Jail Staff et al
Plaintiff: Shawn Otte and Tiffany Bell
Defendant: Randolph County Jail Staff, Randolph County Sheriff Officer, Randolph County Children Division, Chandra Bankhead, Stephanie Wehmeir, Kevin Neese, Mike Fusselman, Kimberly Cook, Melissa Connoley, Macon County Children Division and DFS, Randolph County Juvenile Office, Randolph County DFS Office, James Cooksey, Chezney Nichole Schulte, Parker Cole Schulte and Christina McCartney
Case Number: 2:2022cv00027
Filed: May 4, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Noelle C Collins
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 21, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 LETTER / NOTICE of Change of Address by Plaintiff Shawn Otte. (KCD) Address updated on 6/30/2022 (CMC).
May 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SEALED Exhibits re #8 Amended Complaint, . [Exhibits contain names and records of minors.] (BRP)
May 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant Melissa Connoley, Kimberly Cook, Mike Fusselman, Kevin Neese, Randolph County Juvenile Office, DFS Office, James Cooksey, Chezney Nichole Schulte, Parker Cole Schulte, Christina McCartney, filed by Shawn Otte.(BRP)
May 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Tiffany Bell. Returned document(s): #6 Memorandum & Order. Could not verify new address and mail was not resent. Clerk checked the Missouri DOC and Bureau of Prisons inmate locator for Ms. Bell, which returned negative results. Pursuant to the Motion for IFP #2 , Ms. Bell is not being detained. (TMT)
May 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 OPINION, MEMORANDUM AND ORDER (See Full Order): IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis [ECF No. #2 ] is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE as it is incomplete. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff Tiffany Bell is STRICKEN from this action. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Clerk of Court shall mail to plaintiff two copies of the Courts Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint forms and Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis Prisoner Cases forms. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that that, within twenty-one (21) days of the date of this Order, plaintiff shall file an amended complaint on the Court-provided form and in compliance with the Courts instructions. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that that, within twenty-one (21) days of the date of this Order, plaintiff shall either pay the $402 filing fee or submit a motion to proceed in forma pauperis on the Court-provided form. If plaintiff files a motion to proceed in forma pauperis, he shall also submit a certified copy of his inmate account statement for the six-month period immediately preceding the filing of the complaint. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff's failure to timely comply with this Order shall result in the dismissal of this action, without prejudice and without further notice. (Amended/Supplemental Pleadings due by 5/27/2022) Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 5/6/2022. (copy of order and forms mailed 5/6/2022)(JEB) Modified on 5/9/2022 (TMT).
May 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (Potter, Jacob)
May 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Case transferred in from District of Missouri Western; Case Number 4:22-cv-00267. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Case transferred in electronically.
May 4, 2022 Opinion or Order ***Complaint Letter Created. This is to advise you that this office has received and filed your complaint and has assigned it the above-referenced case number. (JWD)
May 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Case electronically transferred to District of Eastern District of Missouri. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Willis, Kathy)
May 4, 2022 Opinion or Order ***Complaint Letter Processed (see notice of electronic filing for distribution list) Wed May 4 15:01:08 CDT 2022 (admin,)
May 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: Honorable Noelle C. Collins. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. (JWD)
April 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE: ORDERED that this case is transferred to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri for all further proceedings. Signed on April 26, 2022 by District Judge Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr. (Davies, Cindy)
April 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 IFP FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT filed by by Shawn Otte and Tiffany Bell. (Davies, Cindy)
April 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Shawn Otte and Tiffany Bell. (Davies, Cindy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Otte et al v. Randolph County Jail Staff et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawn Otte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiffany Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randolph County Jail Staff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randolph County Sheriff Officer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randolph County Children Division
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chandra Bankhead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephanie Wehmeir
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Neese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Fusselman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberly Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melissa Connoley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Macon County Children Division and DFS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randolph County Juvenile Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randolph County DFS Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Cooksey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chezney Nichole Schulte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parker Cole Schulte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christina McCartney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?