Bell v. Estate of Lori Sue Cumpston et al
Plaintiff: Spencer K. Bell
Defendant: Estate of Lori Sue Cumpston and Wendy Howe
Case Number: 2:2024cv00054
Filed: August 19, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Rodney H Holmes
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER SETTING RULE 16 CONFERENCE. This case is assigned to Track 2: (Standard). Joint Scheduling Plan due by 10/24/2024. Rule 16 Conference set for 10/31/2024 10:00 AM in Zoom Video Conference before Magistrate Judge Rodney H. Holmes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Rodney H. Holmes on 9/26/2024. (HMA)
August 27, 2024 Filing 17 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (auto)
August 27, 2024 Filing 16 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendants Estate of Lori Sue Cumpston, Wendy Howe Sent To: State Court - Executed (Perryman, Ted)
August 22, 2024 Filing 15 AMENDED DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Plaintiff Spencer K. Bell. No corporate parents or affiliates identified. (Wood, Branson) Modified on 8/23/2024 (ANR).
August 21, 2024 Filing 14 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Spencer K. Bell. No corporate parents or affiliates identified. (Wood, Branson)
August 21, 2024 Filing 13 ENTRY of Appearance by Branson L. Wood, III for Plaintiff Spencer K. Bell. (Wood, Branson)
August 21, 2024 Filing 12 FULL CONSENT has been received by Plaintiff Spencer K. Bell, Defendants Estate of Lori Sue Cumpston, Wendy Howe. (ANR)
August 21, 2024 Electronic Notice re: Disclosure Statement to Plaintiff Spencer K. Bell. Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every nongovernmental corporate party or nongovernmental corporation that seeks to intervene in any case, and every party or intervenor in an action in which jurisdiction is based upon diversity, must file a Disclosure Statement immediately upon entering its appearance in the case. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible and add all individuals and entities into CM/ECF as required # (moed-0001.pdf). (ANR)
August 20, 2024 Filing 11 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Wendy Howe. No corporate parents or affiliates identified. (Perryman, Ted)
August 20, 2024 Filing 10 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Estate of Lori Sue Cumpston. No corporate parents or affiliates identified. (Perryman, Ted)
August 20, 2024 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses of Defendants Estate of Lori Sue Cumpston and Marion County Public Administrator, Wendy Howe, Personal Representative of the Estate of Lori Sue Cumpston by Estate of Lori Sue Cumpston, Wendy Howe.(Perryman, Ted)
August 20, 2024 Filing 8 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Marion County Circuit Court, filed by Spencer K. Bell.(JWD)
August 20, 2024 Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: Honorable Rodney H. Holmes. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every nongovernmental corporate party or nongovernmental corporation that seeks to intervene in any case, and every party or intervenor in an action in which jurisdiction is based upon diversity, must file a Disclosure Statement immediately upon entering its appearance in the case. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible. # (moed-0001.pdf). (JWD)
August 19, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendants Estate of Lori Sue Cumpston, Marion County Public Administrator, Wendy Howe, Personal Representative of The Estate of Lori Sue Cumpston Sent To: Plaintiff (Perryman, Ted)
August 19, 2024 Filing 6 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Defendants Estate of Lori Sue Cumpston, Marion County Public Administrator, Wendy Howe, Personal Representative of The Estate of Lori Sue Cumpston. (Perryman, Ted)
August 19, 2024 Filing 5 STIPULATION of Removal by Defendants Estate of Lori Sue Cumpston, Marion County Public Administrator, Wendy Howe, Personal Representative of The Estate of Lori Sue Cumpston. (Perryman, Ted)
August 19, 2024 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Helen P. Paulin for Defendants Estate of Lori Sue Cumpston, Marion County Public Administrator, Wendy Howe, Personal Representative of The Estate of Lori Sue Cumpston. (Paulin, Helen)
August 19, 2024 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Korissa M. Zickrick for Defendants Estate of Lori Sue Cumpston, Marion County Public Administrator, Wendy Howe, Personal Representative of The Estate of Lori Sue Cumpston. (Zickrick, Korissa)
August 19, 2024 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Ted L. Perryman for Defendants Estate of Lori Sue Cumpston, Marion County Public Administrator, Wendy Howe, Personal Representative of The Estate of Lori Sue Cumpston. (Perryman, Ted)
August 19, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Marion County, case number 24MR-CV00929, with receipt number AMOEDC-10775507, in the amount of $405 Jury Demand,, filed by Marion County Public Administrator, Wendy Howe, Personal Representative of The Estate of Lori Sue Cumpston, Estate of Lori Sue Cumpston. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Exhibit A)(Perryman, Ted)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bell v. Estate of Lori Sue Cumpston et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estate of Lori Sue Cumpston
Represented By: Korissa M. Zickrick
Represented By: Helen P. Paulin
Represented By: Ted L. Perryman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Howe
Represented By: Korissa M. Zickrick
Represented By: Helen P. Paulin
Represented By: Ted L. Perryman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Spencer K. Bell
Represented By: Branson L. Wood, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?