Williams v. Biden et al
Plaintiff: Brayon Williams
Defendant: John G. Roberts, Joe Biden, Kamala Harris and Kevin McCarthy
Case Number: 2:2024cv00080
Filed: October 25, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: Hannibal Office
Presiding Judge: Patricia L Cohen
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 23, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER OF DISMISSAL: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this action is DISMISSED without prejudice. IT IS HEREBY CERTIFIED that an appeal from this action would not be taken in good faith. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 12/23/2024. (CLH)
December 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 OPINION, MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's application to proceed in the district court without prepayment of fees and costs is GRANTED. [ECF No. #2 ] IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff's complaint is DISMISSED without prejudice under 28 U.S.C. 1915(d)(2)(B). An Order of Dismissal will accompany this Opinion, Memorandum and Order Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 12/23/2024. (CLH)
December 23, 2024 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 8, 9. Mailed to party not set up for electronic delivery. Mon Dec 23 14:42:52 CST 2024 (Hutson, Chelsea)
December 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Letter from Clerk sent to re: Failure to file Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Notice re: Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction due by 12/17/2024. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Magistrate Consent Form) (LNJ)
December 6, 2024 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 7. Mailed to party not set up for electronic delivery. Fri Dec 6 14:45:33 CST 2024 (Jones, Lauren)
November 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SUPPLEMENTAL re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Brayon Williams. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2, #3 Attachment 3)(JAB)
November 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 AMENDED MEMORANDUM re #4 Memorandum by Plaintiff Brayon Williams. (JAB) Remark: Request by Non-Prisoner Self-Represented Party for Electronic Noticing (moed-0061) mailed to plaintiff.
November 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MEMORANDUM re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Brayon Williams. (JAB)
October 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (auto)
October 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Brayon Williams. (JBH)
October 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant Joe Biden, Kamala Harris, Kevin McCarthy, John G. Roberts Jury Demand,, filed by Brayon Williams. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(JBH) (Main Document 1 replaced on 10/25/2024) (JBH). (Attachment 1 replaced on 10/25/2024) (JBH).
October 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: Honorable Patricia L. Cohen. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. (JBH)
October 25, 2024 Opinion or Order ***Complaint Letter Created. This is to advise you that this office has received and filed your complaint and has assigned it the above-referenced case number. (JBH)
October 25, 2024 Opinion or Order ***Complaint Letter Processed (see notice of electronic filing for distribution list) Fri Oct 25 16:00:53 CDT 2024 (admin,)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Biden et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John G. Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Biden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kamala Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin McCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brayon Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?