March 21, 2013 |
Filing
341
MEMORANDUM to plaintiff. Signed by Judge Charles Kornmann on 3/21/13. (KXS)
|
March 6, 2013 |
Filing
333
MEMORANDUM To Counsel and Mr. Carroll - re: service of subpoenas {see Memorandum for complete details}. Signed by Judge Charles B. Kornmannon 3/6/2013. (MRC)
|
December 19, 2012 |
Filing
305
MEMORANDUM In the Court's Order Fixing Trial Dates (Doc. #295), I required that the parties submit a trial brief to the Court and to opposing counsel no later than 10 working days before trial. After further consideration, I find that the parti es are no longer required to file a trial brief with the Court. You may, however, file a trial brief and proposed jury instructions if you so choose. If you have any questions, please let me know. Signed by United States District Judge Charles B. Kornmann on 12/19/12. (KXS)
|
November 8, 2012 |
Filing
300
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: 1. Plaintiff's request for court appointed counsel 298 is denied. 2. Plaintiff's motion for leave to file a surreply on reconsideration of his state law tort claims 299 is denied. Signed by the Honorable Charles B. Kornmann on 11/8/12. (KXS)
|
September 28, 2012 |
Filing
292
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER IT IS ORDERED 1. The motion of defendants Brian Dolan, Charles Johnson, and Jerry Leyshock to dismiss (Doc. #284) is denied. 2. Plaintiff's motion to reconsider (Doc. #286) is denied. 3. Plaintiff's motion for l eave to file an amended complaint (Doc. #287) is denied. 4. Plaintiff's motion to amend his Second Amended Complaint (Doc. #289) is denied. 5. Defendant City of St. Louis Police Department shall, by on or before October 15, 2012, provide statist ics to the plaintiff on the complaints of excessive force resulting from alleged prolonged exposure to pepper spray between 1990 and 2000, the outcomes of those complaints, and the disciplinary action taken, if any, associated with those complaints. Signed by Judge Charles B. Kornmann on 9/28/12. (KXS)
|
July 3, 2012 |
Filing
283
MEMORANDUM OPINION -- IT IS ORDERED: 1. The motion ofdefendants Brian Dolan, Charles Johnson, and Jerry Leyshock for leave to file a supplemental motion for summary judgment (Doc. # 265 ) is denied. 2. Plaintiff's motion for extension oftime to respond to defendants' supplemental motion for summary judgment (Doc. # 266 ) is denied as moot. 3. Plaintiff's motion to deny defendants' motion for leave to supplement (Doc. # 267 ) is denied as moot.3. Plaintiff's motion to reconsider this court's grant of summary judgment in favor of defendants st. Louis City and St. Louis Police Department (Doc. # 270 ) is denied. 4. Plaintiff's motion for leave to file a motion for reconsideration ofthe grant of summar y judgment to the St. Louis Police Department (Doc. # 274 ) is granted. The St. Louis Police Department is ordered to comply with plaintiff's request for the number ofcomplaints of excessive force resulting from alleged prolonged exposure to pepper spray between 1990 and 2000, the outcomes ofthose complaints, and the disciplinary action taken, if any, associated with those complaints. Plaintiffs remaining requests for additional discovery are denied. The court vacates, in part, its O rders of September 30,2011 (Doc. # 263 ), and February 26,2010 (Doc. # 226 ), only insofar as necessary to accommodate this request. 5. Plaintiff's request for leave to conduct further discovery (Doc. # 275 ) is denied. 6.Michael Hughes motion to withdraw (Doc. # 278 ) as counsel for the St. Louis City defendants is granted. Signed by Honorable Charles B. Kornmann on 7/3/12. (KCM)
|
September 30, 2011 |
Filing
263
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER -- IT IS ORDERED 1. Defendants Michael Sisco, Keith Coleman, and Michael McCann's motion to reconsider this court's denial of summary judgment disposing of plaintiff's claims against them 229 is gr anted. 2. Defendants Michael Sisco, Keith Coleman, and Michael McCann's motions for summry judgment 190 193 are granted in full. 3. Defendants Brian Dolan, Charles Johnson, Jerry Leyshock, Harry Hegger, Ronnie Henderson, and the St. Louis Boa rd of Police Commissioners motion to grant summary judgment in their favor on all of plaintiff's claims against them 230 is granted in part and denied in part as set forth above. 4. Plaintiff's motion to reconsider this court's grant of summary judgment in favor of all University City defendants 232 is denied. 5. Plaintiff's motion to reconsider this court's grant of summary judgment in favor of defendant St. Louis City 233 is denied. 6. Plaintiff's request to reconsider this court's denial of plaintiff's motion to appoint counsel 240 is denied. 7. Plaintiff's motion to produce documents 244 is denied. 8. Plaintiff's motions to compel discovery 250 258 are denied. 9. Plaintiff 039;s motion to reconsider this court's determinations on the facts and on plaintiff's discovery requests 257 is denied. 10. The motions of defendants St. Louis City Police Department and Brian Dolan, Harry Hegger, Ronnie Henderson, Charl es Johnson, and Jerry Leyshock to extend time to respond to plaintiff's motions to compel 252 253 are denied. 11. The motion of defendants St. Louis City Police Department and Brian Dolan, Harry Hegger, Ronnie Henderson, Charles Johnson, and Jerry Leyshock to respond out of time to plaintiff's motion for reconsideration 261 is granted. 12. The clerk shall not accept for filing and no party shall file any further motions for reconsideration without the court first authorizing any such filing. Signed by Honorable Charles B. Kornmann on 9/30/11. (KCM)
|
March 16, 2010 |
Filing
228
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER -- IT IS ORDERED: 1. The City of St. Louis' motion, 196 for summary judgment is granted. All claims against the City of St. Louis are dismissed. 2. The University City's motion, 203 for summary judgment is g ranted. All claims against University City and its officers are dismissed. 3. The St. Louis County defendant's motions, 190 and 193 , are granted in part and denied in part as set forth above. 4. The plaintiff's motion, 206 , to take judicial notice is denied. 5. Plaintiff's request, 211 , for a declaratory judgment is denied. Signed by Charles B. Kornmann on 3/16/10. (KCM)
|