Baum et al v. Maplewood City Library et al Featured Case

First Amendment claim against library that its filters overblock websites with constitutionally protected speech, such as hate speech. Consent judgment requires libraries to disable filters on request by adults for bona fide purposes, and to stop overblocking beyond CIPA categories.

Plaintiff: Gordon Lee Baum and Council of Conservative Citizens
Case Number: 4:2006cv00453
Filed: March 13, 2006
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: St. Louis Office
County: St. Charles
Presiding Judge: Catherine D. Perry
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2007 Filing 28
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Gordon Lee Baum, Council of Conservative Citizens (Herman, Robert)
February 20, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 27
ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff shall, within fourteen (14) daysof the date of this order, file an appropriate motion for default judgment as to Festus City Library. The motion should either contain a request for a hearing or, if plaintiff believes the motion can be resolved on the papers, then the motion should be supported by all necessary affidavits and documentation, as well as a proposed order for the Court's consideration. Failure to comply with this order may result in dismissal of the action as tothis defendant without prejudice. Signed by Judge Catherine D. Perry on 2/20/2007. (JMW)
February 5, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 26
CONSENT JUDGMENT - APPROVED AND SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Catherine D. Perry on 2/5/07. (KLH, )
February 2, 2007 Filing 25
MEMORANDUM - CONSENT JUDGMENT by Plaintiffs Gordon Lee Baum, Council of Conservative Citizens, Defendants Maplewood City Library, University City Public Library, City of. (Dunne, Peter)
January 10, 2007 Filing 24
CONSENT JUDGMENT - Valley Park Community Library terminated. (See Judgment for details). Signed by Judge Catherine D. Perry on 1/10/07. (BAK, )
July 17, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 22
ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs' motions for default judgment15 & 17 are denied as premature without prejudice. Signed by Judge Catherine D. Perry on 7/17/2006. (JMW)
July 13, 2006 Filing 20
OFFER of Judgment by Defendants Maplewood City Library, University City Public Library, City of. (Dunne, Peter)
June 8, 2006 Filing 18
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Defendant Festus City Library. Copy sent to City of Festus, 711 West Main Street, Festus, MO 63028 (BAK, )
May 24, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 14
ORDER re 13 MOTION to Continue Rule 16 Conference filed by Gordon Lee Baum,, Council of Conservative Citizens is GRANTED and the Rule 16 scheduling conference is reset for Monday, July 17, 2006, at 9:30 a.m. Rule 16 Conference set for 7/17/2006 09:30 AM in In Chambers before Honorable Catherine D. Perry. Signed by Judge Catherine D. Perry on May 24, 2006. (MCB)
May 23, 2006 Filing 13
MOTION to Continue Rule 16 Conference by Plaintiffs Gordon Lee Baum, Council of Conservative Citizens. (Herman, Robert)
May 16, 2006 Filing 9
ENTRY of Appearance by Charles E. Reis, IV for Defendant Valley Park Community Library. (Reis, Charles)
May 12, 2006 Filing 8
ANSWER to Complaint by Maplewood City Library, University City Public Library, City of.(Dunne, Peter)
April 13, 2006 Filing 5
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Gordon Lee Baum, Council of Conservative Citizens Maplewood City Library waiver signed on 4/7/2006, answer due 6/6/2006. (Herman, Robert)
April 7, 2006 Filing 4
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Gordon Lee Baum, Council of Conservative Citizens Valley Park Community Library waiver signed on 3/17/2006, answer due 5/16/2006. (Herman, Robert)
March 13, 2006 Filing 2
DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATION INTERESTS CERTIFICATE filed by Plaintiff Council of Conservative Citizens. (CDD, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baum et al v. Maplewood City Library et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gordon Lee Baum
Represented By: Robert Herman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Council of Conservative Citizens
Represented By: Robert Herman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?