Atkins v. Purkett
Case Number: 4:2006cv01549
Filed: October 23, 2006
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: St. Louis Office
Presiding Judge: Henry E. Autrey
Presiding Judge: Frederick R Buckles
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 15 JUDGMENT : In accordance with the Opinion, Memorandum and Order entered this same date, ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the Petition of Jermaine C. Atkins for Writ of Habeas Corpus is dismissed. FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the Court will not issue a Certificate of Appealability.. Signed by Honorable Henry E. Autrey on 2/19/10. (CEL)
January 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 13 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS - IT IS HEREBY RECOMMENDED that Steve Larkins be substituted for James Purkett as proper party respondent in the cause. IT IS FURTHER RECOMMENDED that petitioner Jermaine C. Atkins petition for writ of habeas corpus pursuan t to 28 U.S.C. § 2254 (Docket No. 1 ) be dismissed without further proceedings. IT IS FURTHER RECOMMENDED that no certificate of appealability be issued in this cause inasmuch as petitioner has failed to make a substantial showing that he has b een denied a constitutional right. The parties are advised that they have to and including January 26, 2010, by which to file written objections to this Report and Recommendation. Failure to timely file objections may result in waiver of the right to appeal questions of fact. Thompson v. Nix, 897 F.2d 356, 357 (8th Cir. 1990). Signed by Magistrate Judge Frederick R. Buckles on 1/12/10. (KJF, )
October 25, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Signed by Judge Henry E. Autrey on 10/25/06. (CEL, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Atkins v. Purkett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?