Carpenters' District Council Of Greater St. Louis and Vicinity et al v. F.G. Lancia Custom Woodworking, LLC
Case Number: 4:2006cv01673
Filed: November 17, 2006
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: St. Louis Office
Presiding Judge: Charles A. Shaw
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 157 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER -.....IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs' motion to compel is GRANTED. [Doc. 155] IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Cecilia M. Lancia shall appear for a post-judgment deposition and produce the records requeste d in the Notice of Rule 69 Deposition and Request for Production of Documents, at the offices of plaintiffs' counsel on Wednesday, August 10, 2016, at 10:00 a.m. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall serve a copy of this Memorandum and Order on Ms. Lancia's attorney J. Steven Erickson, 2330 Menard Street, #201, St. Louis, Missouri 63104, by UPS Signature Required, in addition to service by first-class mail. Signed by District Judge Charles A. Shaw on 7/19/2016. (MRC)
January 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER -....IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motions to withdraw as counsel for the defendants filed by attorneys David W. Forth, Michael H. James and the law firm of the law firm of James, Hutchison & Forth, P.C. are DENIED without prejudice. [Docs. 144, 146]. Signed by District Judge Charles A. Shaw on 1/6/2016. (MRC)
December 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 148 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs' Motion for a Creditor's Bill in Equity and to Pierce the Corporate Veil is GRANTED. [Doc. 142 ] Signed by District Judge Charles A. Shaw on 12/21/15. (JWD)
November 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 147 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER....IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendants shall obtain new counsel and defendants' substitute counsel shall enter an appearance on their behalf by December 30, 2015. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that attorneys David W . Forth and Michael H. James shall provide a copy of this Order to the defendants and file a notice with the Court certifying that they have done so, by December 9, 2015. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that upon the entry of substitute counsel, or i f no such entry occurs, on or after January 4, 2016, the Court will issue a ruling on the merits of the motions to withdraw of attorneys David W. Forth, Michael H. James and the law firm of the law firm of James, Hutchison & Forth, P.C. Response to Court due by 12/30/2015.. Signed by District Judge Charles A. Shaw on 11/30/2015. (MRC)
October 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 114 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendant Frank Lancia is ordered to show cause why he should not be held in contempt of court for failure to appear for deposition and to produce records on September 24, 2013, as ordered by the Cour t on September 5, 2013. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a hearing is set for Tuesday, November 26, 2013, at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom No. 3-N of the Thomas F. Eagleton United States Courthouse, at which defendant Frank Lancia may show cause why civil contem pt sanctions should not be imposed against him for failure to comply with the Courts Order of September 5, 2013. Because incarceration is a possible civil contempt sanction, defendant Lancia has the right to representation by counsel. Failure to a ppear for the hearing as ordered may subject defendant Lancia to arrest by the United States Marshals Service. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the United States Marshals Service is directed to serve a copy of this Memorandum and Order on defendant Frank Lancia personally, at F.G. Lancia Custom Woodworking, LLC, 813 N. Skinker, St. Louis, Missouri 63130, or wherever he may be found. Signed by District Judge Charles A. Shaw on 10/23/2013. (RAK)
September 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 110 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs motion to compel is GRANTED. [Doc. 106] IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendant Frank Lancia shall appear for a post-judgment deposition and produce the records requested in the Notice of Rule 69 Deposition and Request for Production of Documents, at the offices of plaintiffs counsel on Tuesday, September 24, 2013, at 10:00 a.m.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall mail a copy of this order to defendant Frank Lancia at F.G. Lancia Custom Woodworking, LLC, 813 N. Skinker, St. Louis, Missouri 63130, by first-class and certified mail. ( Response to Court due by 9/24/2013.) Signed by District Judge Charles A. Shaw on 9/5/13. (JWJ)
November 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 92 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs' motion to compel discovery is GRANTED. [Doc. 81] IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendants shall produce all records relating to monies currently owed to Frank Lancia, F.G.L. Woodworking and Audio-Video, Inc., and/or F.G. Lancia Custom Woodworking, LLC, at the offices of plaintiffs counsel by November 30, 2010. Signed by Honorable Charles A. Shaw on 11/16/2010. (NCL)
September 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 77 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs Motion for a Creditors Bill in Equity and to Pierce the Corporate Veil is GRANTED. [Doc. 64 ] Signed by Honorable Charles A. Shaw on 9/29/09. (KJF, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carpenters' District Council Of Greater St. Louis and Vicinity et al v. F.G. Lancia Custom Woodworking, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?