Fuller v. United States of America
Petitioner: Terrance E. Fuller
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 4:2007cv00034
Filed: January 10, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: St. Louis Office
County: St. Louis - City
Presiding Judge: Charles A. Shaw
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255 Motion to Vacate / Correct Illegal Sentenc
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 49 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED movant Terrence E. Fuller's motion for relief from final judgment pursuant to Rule 60(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure is DENIED. [Doc. 32] IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Court will not issue a certificate of appealability. Signed by District Judge Charles A. Shaw on 7/10/2013. (NCL)
April 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order, respondent shall file a memorandum of law in response to movant's motion seeking relief from final judgment. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if movant chooses to file a reply to respondent's response memorandum, he shall file such reply within 30 days of the date of the response. If petitioner fails to timely file his reply, the right to file a reply shall be waived. Response to Court due by 5/24/2012. Signed by Honorable Charles A. Shaw on 4/24/2012. (KSM)
February 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 20 JUDGMENT - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED and DECREED that the instant Motion to Vacate, Set Aside, or Correct Sentence pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 2255, is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that movant has not made (1) a substantial showing of the deni al of a constitutional right, such that reasonable jurists would find the Courts assessment of the constitutional claims debatable, or that the issues presented were adequate to deserve encouragement to proceed further, Miller-El v. Cockrell, 537 U.S . 322, 336 (2003), or (2) a showing that reasonable jurists would find it debatable whether the Courts procedural rulings are correct, and therefore this Court will not issue a certificate of appealability. See Slack v. McDaniel, 529 U.S. 473, 484-85 (2000). Signed by Honorable Charles A. Shaw on 2/8/10. (KJF, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fuller v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Terrance E. Fuller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: John T. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?