Neighborhood Enterprises, Inc. et al v. City of St. Louis et al
Plaintiff: Neighborhood Enterprises, Inc., Sanctuary in the Ordinary and Jim Roos
Defendant: St. Louis, City of, St. Louis Board of Adjustment, Shari Cunningham, George Hitt, Joe Klitzing, Irene Soll, John Caruso and Mary Hart Burton
Case Number: 4:2007cv01546
Filed: August 31, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: St. Louis Office
County: St. Louis - City
Presiding Judge: Charles A. Shaw
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 142 OPINION, MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs' Motion for Attorneys' Fees And Cost, [Doc. No. 129 ] is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs are awarded attorneys' fees in the amount of $159,843.75 and Costs in the amount of $300.. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 12/15/17. (KKS)
October 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 105 MEMOPINION, MEMORANDUM AND ORDER HEREBY ORDERED that Petitioners' Motion to Alter or Amend Judgment, [Doc. No. 100 ], is granted. HEREBY ORDERED that Sections 26.68.020(17), 26.68.030 and 26.68.050 of the former Sign Code are not severable fro m Chapter 26.68. FURTHER ORDERED that Petitioners' are awarded $1.00 nominal damages. FURTHER ORDERED that Respondents are given 14 days from the date of this Opinion, Memorandum and Order to file a responsive brief to Petitioners' cl aim regarding the alleged vested right in their mural. FURTHER ORDERED that Petitioners are given 14 days from the date of this Opinion, Memorandum and Order to amend their complaint if they so desire.( Response to Court due by 11/14/2014.). Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 10/31/2014. (CLK)
April 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 96 OPINION MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Sections 26.68.020(17), 26.68.030 and 26.68.050 of the former Sign Code are severable from the Code.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that application of the size and locationrestrictions to Plaintiffs sign is proper. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Respondents Motions for Entry of Judgment is granted. A separate judgment is entered this same date. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 4/24/14. (CLA)
March 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 71 JUDGMENT IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that summary jgm. is entered in favor respondents and against petitioners. Signed by Honorable Henry E. Autrey on 3/29/10. (CLA)
November 5, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 22 OPINION MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Motion to Dismiss, [Doc. 5 in CauseNumber 4:07CV1505 HEA] is GRANTED.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Motion to Dismiss, [Doc. 11 inCause Number 4:07CV1546 HEA] is granted in part and denied in part.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Shari Cunningham, George Hitt, JoeKlitzing, Irene Soll, and John Caruso, in their official capacity as members of theBoard of Adjustment, and Mary Hart Burton, in her official capacity as the St. LouisZoning Administr ator are dismissed from this action.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all Cause Number 4:07CV1546 HEA isno longer consolidated with Cause Number 4:07CV1505 HEA. The Clerk of theCourt shall reopen Cause Number 4:07CV1546 HEA and all further pleadings shallbe made with this Cause Number. Signed by Judge Henry E. Autrey on 11/5/07. (CLA, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Neighborhood Enterprises, Inc. et al v. City of St. Louis et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Neighborhood Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: John B. Randall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sanctuary in the Ordinary
Represented By: John B. Randall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jim Roos
Represented By: John B. Randall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Louis, City of
Represented By: Robert M. Hibbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Louis Board of Adjustment
Represented By: Robert M. Hibbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shari Cunningham
Represented By: Robert M. Hibbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Hitt
Represented By: Robert M. Hibbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Klitzing
Represented By: Robert M. Hibbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Irene Soll
Represented By: Robert M. Hibbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Caruso
Represented By: Robert M. Hibbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Hart Burton
Represented By: Robert M. Hibbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?