Saint Louis University v. Meyer Featured Case
Plaintiff: Saint Louis University
Defendant: Avis Meyer
Case Number: 4:2007cv01733
Filed: October 11, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: St. Louis Office
County: St. Louis - City
Presiding Judge: Audrey G. Fleissig
Presiding Judge:
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:44 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 30, 2010. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 2, 2009 Filing 140 SURREPLY to Motion re 128 regarding defendant's motion for attorney's fees filed by Plaintiff Saint Louis University. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(DJO)
June 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER; IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for entry of sanctions [Doc.# 26 ] is granted in part and denied in part. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendant shall pay to plaintiff $6,757.08 for attorney's fees incurred in connection with plaintiff's motion for sanctions for spoliation of evidence. Signed by Honorable Carol E. Jackson on 06/02/2009;(DJO)
June 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER; IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to alter or amend judgment[Doc. # 125 ] is denied. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendant's motion for attorneys' fees under the Lanham Act [Doc. # 128 ] is denied. Signed by Honorable Carol E. Jackson on 06/02/2009;(DJO)
May 4, 2009 Filing 137 RESPONSE in Opposition re 136 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply Re Defendant's Motion for Attorney's Fees under Lanham Act filed by Defendant Avis Meyer. (Gill, Brian)
April 22, 2009 Filing 136 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply Re Defendant's Motion for Attorney's Fees under Lanham Act by Plaintiff Saint Louis University. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Plaintiff's Sur-Reply, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Plaintiff's Sur-Reply)(Janoski, Frank) Modified on 6/4/2009 (DJO).
April 13, 2009 Filing 135 REPLY to Response to Motion re 128 MOTION for Attorney Fees UNDER THE LANHAM ACT filed by Defendant Avis Meyer. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Nolte, Nelson)
April 8, 2009 Filing 134 REPLY to Response to Motion re 126 MOTION for Sanctions and Memorandum in Support Regarding Defendant's Destruction of Evidence filed by Plaintiff Saint Louis University. (Janoski, Frank)
April 8, 2009 Filing 133 REPLY to Response to Motion re 125 MOTION to Alter Judgment Pursuant to Rule 59(E) or in the Alternative a Request for Additional Clarification and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Saint Louis University. (Janoski, Frank)
April 2, 2009 Filing 132 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 128 MOTION for Attorney Fees UNDER THE LANHAM ACT filed by Plaintiff Saint Louis University. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit)(Janoski, Frank)
March 27, 2009 Filing 131 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 126 MOTION for Sanctions and Memorandum in Support Regarding Defendant's Destruction of Evidence filed by Defendant Avis Meyer. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Nolte, Nelson)
March 27, 2009 Filing 130 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 125 MOTION to Alter Judgment Pursuant to Rule 59(E) or in the Alternative a Request for Additional Clarification and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant Avis Meyer. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Nolte, Nelson)
March 17, 2009 Filing 129 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re 128 MOTION for Attorney Fees UNDER THE LANHAM ACT filed by Defendant Avis Meyer. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit a)(Nolte, Nelson)
March 17, 2009 Filing 128 MOTION for Attorney Fees UNDER THE LANHAM ACT by Defendant Avis Meyer. (Nolte, Nelson)
March 17, 2009 Filing 127 NOTICE Verification of Signed Original Document: by Plaintiff Saint Louis University re 126 MOTION for Sanctions and Memorandum in Support Regarding Defendant's Destruction of Evidence (Janoski, Frank)
March 17, 2009 Filing 126 MOTION for Sanctions and Memorandum in Support Regarding Defendant's Destruction of Evidence by Plaintiff Saint Louis University. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Janoski Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Meyer Deposition (Part 1), # 3 Exhibit 2 - Meyer Deposition (Part 2), # 4 Exhibit 3 - Secretary of State Documents)(Janoski, Frank)
March 17, 2009 Filing 125 MOTION to Alter Judgment Pursuant to Rule 59(E) or in the Alternative a Request for Additional Clarification and Memorandum in Support by Plaintiff Saint Louis University. (Janoski, Frank)
March 16, 2009 Filing 124 NOTICE OF DEFENDANT'S CERTIFICATION OF COMPLIANCE PURSUANT TO D/E 119: by Defendant Avis Meyer (Gill, Brian)
March 4, 2009 Filing 123 TRANSCRIPT of Motion proceedings held on August 20, 2008 before Judge Carol E. Jackson. Court Reporter: Gary Bond, Telephone number 314.244.7980. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/25/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/6/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/2/2009. (KKS)
March 4, 2009 Filing 122 TRANSCRIPT of Pretrial Motion proceedings of held on March 2, 2009 before Judge Carol E. Jackson. Court Reporter: Gary Bond, Telephone number 314.244.7980. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/25/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/6/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/2/2009. (KKS)
March 4, 2009 Filing 121 TRANSCRIPT of Motion proceedings held on JUNE 11, 2008 before Judge CAROL E. JACKSON. Court Reporter: GARY BOND, Telephone number 314.244.7980. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/25/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/6/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/2/2009. (KKS) (KKS).
March 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties' joint motion regarding Count VII of plaintiff's complaint 117 is granted.. Signed by Honorable Carol E. Jackson on 3/3/09. (KKS)
March 3, 2009 Filing 119 FINDINGS OF FACT, CONCLUSIONS OF LAW, and Declaratory, Injunctive and Other Relief. Signed by Honorable Carol E. Jackson on 3/3/09. (KKS)
March 3, 2009 Filing 118 JUDGMENT : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED and DECREED that summary judgment is entered in favor of defendant Avis Meyer and against plaintiff Saint Louis University on Counts I through VI of the complaint, in accordance with the Memorandum and Order entered on December 24, 2008. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED and DECREED that judgment is entered in favor of plaintiff Saint Louis University and against defendant Avis Meyer on Count VII of the complaint, in accordance with the Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law entered on March 3, 2009.. Signed by Honorable Carol E. Jackson on 3/3/09. (KKS)
March 3, 2009 Filing 117 STIPULATION by Plaintiff Saint Louis University. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Findings of Fact, Conclusions of Law, and Declaratory, Injunctive and Other Relief, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Findings of Fact)(Janoski, Frank)
March 2, 2009 Filing 116 Minute Entry for Non-Jury (Day 1) proceedings held before Honorable Carol E. Jackson; Court heard arguments on the pending motions in limine and made rulings; Motions #93,96,98 denied w/o prejudice; Motion #92 granted; Motion #102 denied as moot; Motion #36 granted in part & denied in part - defendant to pay attorneys fees related to the motion; Attorneys for both parties made opening statements then recessed for settlement proceedings; Parties settled the case and will submit a written consent to the court (Court Reporter or FTR Gold Operator initials:Gary Bond.) (FTR Gold yes or no: no.) (Proceedings: 9:41-10:28 and 3:40-3:45) (KKS)
February 27, 2009 Filing 115 ENTRY of Appearance by David A. Weder for Plaintiff Saint Louis University. (Weder, David)
February 25, 2009 Filing 114 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER; IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendant shall pay to plaintiff $3,930.40 for attorney's fees incurred in connection with plaintiff's motion to compel full and complete responses to interrogatories; Signed by Honorable Carol E. Jackson on 02/25/2009;(DJO)
February 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER; IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties' joint motion for pretrial conference [Doc. # 112 ] is denied. The parties' pretrial motions will be addressed at the commencement of trial on March 2, 2009; Signed by Honorable Carol E. Jackson on 02/20/2009. (DJO)
February 16, 2009 Filing 112 Joint MOTION for Hearing /Pretrial Conference by Plaintiff Saint Louis University. (Janoski, Frank)
February 2, 2009 Filing 111 SEALED DOCUMENT re 110 Sealed Document, EXHIBIT 4 TO D/E 110 by Defendant Avis Meyer. (Gill, Brian)
February 2, 2009 Filing 110 SEALED DOCUMENT re 96 MOTION in Limine TO EXCLUDE WITNESSES UNTIMELY DISCLOSED BY PLAINTIFF, 105 Response in Opposition to Motion, DEFENDANT'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF IT'S MOTION IN LIMINE by Defendant Avis Meyer. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-Meyer Deposition, # 2 Exhibit 2-Plaintiff's Response to Production Request, # 3 Exhibit 3-Benanti Deposition, # 4 Exhibit 4-Defendant's Trial Exhibits A, C, D)(Gill, Brian)
January 29, 2009 Filing 109 REPLY to Response to Motion re 93 MOTION in Limine filed by Plaintiff Saint Louis University. (Janoski, Frank)
January 23, 2009 Filing 108 RESPONSE to Motion re 102 MOTION to Strike 101 Objection to Pretrial, 96 MOTION in Limine TO EXCLUDE WITNESSES UNTIMELY DISCLOSED BY PLAINTIFF, 100 Objection to Pretrial, 99 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 98 MOTION in Limine, 97 Memorandum in Support of Mo MOTION to Strike 101 Objection to Pretrial, 96 MOTION in Limine TO EXCLUDE WITNESSES UNTIMELY DISCLOSED BY PLAINTIFF, 100 Objection to Pretrial, 99 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 98 MOTION in Limine, 97 Memorandum in Support of Mo filed by Defendant Avis Meyer. (Nolte, Nelson)
January 23, 2009 Filing 107 NOTICE by Plaintiff Saint Louis University re 105 Response in Opposition to Motion, Verification of Signed Original Document (Janoski, Frank)
January 23, 2009 Filing 106 RESPONSE in Opposition re 98 MOTION in Limine filed by Plaintiff Saint Louis University. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Article, # 2 Exhibit 2 (Part 1) - Meyer Depo, # 3 Exhibit 2 (Part 2) - Meyer Depo)(Janoski, Frank)
January 23, 2009 Filing 105 RESPONSE in Opposition re 96 MOTION in Limine TO EXCLUDE WITNESSES UNTIMELY DISCLOSED BY PLAINTIFF filed by Plaintiff Saint Louis University. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 Part 1 - Meyer Depo, # 2 Exhibit 1 Part 2 - Meyer Depo, # 3 Exhibit 2 Part 1 - Benanti Depo, # 4 Exhibit 2 Part 2 - Benanti Depo, # 5 Exhibit 3 - Hoy Affidavit, # 6 Exhibit 4 - Emails)(Janoski, Frank)
January 16, 2009 Filing 104 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 93 MOTION in Limine filed by Defendant Avis Meyer. (Gill, Brian)
January 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendants motion for continuance of the trial date [Doc. #95] is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this matter is reset for non-jury trial on Monday, March 2, 2009, at 9:30 a.m. ORDER granting 95 Motion to Continue trial Bench Trial set for 3/2/2009 09:30 AM in Courtroom 14N before Honorable Carol E. Jackson. Signed by Honorable Carol E. Jackson on 1/14/09. (KMS)
January 13, 2009 Filing 102 MOTION to Strike 101 Objection to Pretrial, 96 MOTION in Limine TO EXCLUDE WITNESSES UNTIMELY DISCLOSED BY PLAINTIFF, 100 Objection to Pretrial, 99 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 98 MOTION in Limine, 97 Memorandum in Support of Motion by Plaintiff Saint Louis University. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Janoski, Frank)
January 12, 2009 Filing 101 OBJECTION to Pretrial re 84 Deposition List DEFENDANT'S OBJECTIONS AND COUNTER-DESIGNATIONS TO PLAINTIFF'S DISCOVERY DESIGNATIONS by Defendant Avis Meyer. Related document: 84 Deposition List filed by Saint Louis University.(Gill, Brian)
January 12, 2009 Filing 100 OBJECTION to Pretrial re 82 Exhibit List by Defendant Avis Meyer. Related document: 82 Exhibit List filed by Saint Louis University.(Gill, Brian)
January 12, 2009 Filing 99 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re 98 MOTION in Limine filed by Defendant Avis Meyer. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit One, # 2 Exhibit Two)(Gill, Brian)
January 12, 2009 Filing 98 MOTION in Limine by Defendant Avis Meyer. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gill, Brian)
January 12, 2009 Filing 97 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re 96 MOTION in Limine TO EXCLUDE WITNESSES UNTIMELY DISCLOSED BY PLAINTIFF filed by Defendant Avis Meyer. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit One)(Gill, Brian)
January 12, 2009 Filing 96 MOTION in Limine TO EXCLUDE WITNESSES UNTIMELY DISCLOSED BY PLAINTIFF by Defendant Avis Meyer. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit One, # 3 Exhibit Two)(Gill, Brian)
January 12, 2009 Filing 95 Consent MOTION to Continue Trial Date by Defendant Avis Meyer. (Gill, Brian)
January 9, 2009 Filing 94 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re 93 MOTION in Limine filed by Plaintiff Saint Louis University. (Janoski, Frank)
January 9, 2009 Filing 93 MOTION in Limine by Plaintiff Saint Louis University. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Janoski, Frank)
January 9, 2009 Filing 92 MOTION for Leave to Amend Exhibit List by Plaintiff Saint Louis University. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Registration of Fictitious Name, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Plaintiff's Amended Exhibit List, # 3 Text of Proposed Order 3 - Proposed Order)(Janoski, Frank)
January 9, 2009 Filing 91 OBJECTION to Pretrial re 86 Exhibit List by Plaintiff Saint Louis University. Related document: 86 Exhibit List filed by Avis Meyer.(Janoski, Frank)
January 9, 2009 Filing 90 OBJECTION to Pretrial re 88 Deposition Designations Objections and Counter-Designations to Defendant's Discovery Designations by Plaintiff Saint Louis University. Related document: 88 Deposition Designations filed by Avis Meyer.(Janoski, Frank)
December 31, 2008 Filing 89 TRIAL BRIEF by Defendant Avis Meyer. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit One, # 2 Exhibit Two)(Nolte, Nelson)
December 31, 2008 Filing 88 Deposition Designations by Defendant Avis Meyer.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit One, # 2 Exhibit Two, # 3 Exhibit Three)(Nolte, Nelson)
December 31, 2008 Filing 87 Witness List by Defendant Avis Meyer. (Nolte, Nelson)
December 31, 2008 Filing 86 Exhibit List DEFENDANT'S TRIAL EXHIBIT LIST by Defendant Avis Meyer.. (Nolte, Nelson)
December 31, 2008 Filing 85 TRIAL BRIEF by Plaintiff Saint Louis University. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Janoski, Frank)
December 31, 2008 Filing 84 Deposition List by Plaintiff Saint Louis University. (Janoski, Frank)
December 31, 2008 Filing 83 Witness List by Plaintiff Saint Louis University. (Janoski, Frank)
December 31, 2008 Filing 82 Exhibit List by Plaintiff Saint Louis University.. (Janoski, Frank)
December 31, 2008 Filing 81 Stipulation of Uncontested Facts by Plaintiff Saint Louis University, Defendant Avis Meyer. (Janoski, Frank)
December 24, 2008 Filing 80 SURREPLY to Motion re 55 MOTION for summary judgment filed by Plaintiff Saint Louis University. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 part 1, # 2 Exhibit 1 part 2, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3)(KXS)
December 24, 2008 Filing 79 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendant's motion for summary judgment on Counts I through VI of plaintiff's complaint [Doc. #55] is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendant's motion for summary judgment as to monetary damages [Doc. #57] is denied as moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for leave to file a sur-reply [Doc. #74] is granted. Signed by Honorable Carol E. Jackson on 12/24/08. (KXS)
December 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER denying 75 Motion to Amend/Correct Signed by Honorable Carol E. Jackson on 12/24/2008. (CEJ)
December 4, 2008 Filing 77 REPLY to Response to Motion re 75 MOTION to Amend/Correct 12 Case Management Order, DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL DATE filed by Defendant Avis Meyer. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nolte, Nelson)
December 3, 2008 Filing 76 RESPONSE to Motion re 75 MOTION to Amend/Correct 12 Case Management Order, DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL DATE filed by Plaintiff Saint Louis University. (Hoy, Bridget)
December 2, 2008 Filing 75 MOTION to Amend/Correct 12 Case Management Order, DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL DATE by Defendant Avis Meyer. (Nolte, Nelson)
November 14, 2008 Filing 74 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply Regarding Defendant's Motions for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Saint Louis University. (Attachments: # 1 Sur-Reply, # 2 Exhibit 1 to Sur-Reply (Part 1), # 3 Exhibit 1 to Sur-Reply (Part 2), # 4 Exhibit 2 to Sur-Reply, # 5 Exhibit 3 to Sur-Reply)(Hoy, Bridget)
November 7, 2008 Filing 73 NOTICE DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S STATEMENT OF ADDITIONAL DISPUTED FACTS: by Defendant Avis Meyer re 65 Response to Motion, (Gill, Brian)
November 7, 2008 Filing 72 REPLY to Response to Motion re 57 MOTION for Summary Judgment AS TO NO MONETARY DAMAGES DUE IN FAVOR OF PLAINTIFF DEFENDANT'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by Defendant Avis Meyer. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Gill, Brian)
November 7, 2008 Filing 71 REPLY to Response to Motion re 55 MOTION for Summary Judgment AS TO COUNTS I-VI OF THE COMPLAINT DEFENDANT'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by Defendant Avis Meyer. (Gill, Brian)
November 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendant's motion for extension of time until November 7, 2008, to file replies in support of his motion for summary judgment 69 is granted.. Signed by Honorable Carol E. Jackson on 11/4/08. (KKS)
October 30, 2008 Filing 69 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 67 Response to Motion, 66 Response to Motion,, 65 Response to Motion, 64 Response in Opposition to Motion,, 57 MOTION for Summary Judgment AS TO NO MONETARY DAMAGES DUE IN FAVOR OF PLAINTIFF, 55 MOTION for Summary Judgment AS TO COUNTS I-VI OF THE COMPLAINT by Defendant Avis Meyer. (Gill, Brian)
October 22, 2008 Filing 68 NOTICE Verification of Signed Original Documents: by Plaintiff Saint Louis University re 66 Response to Motion,, 64 Response in Opposition to Motion,, (Janoski, Frank)
October 21, 2008 Filing 67 RESPONSE to Motion re 55 MOTION for Summary Judgment AS TO COUNTS I-VI OF THE COMPLAINT Response to Defendant's Statement of Uncontroverted Facts Regarding Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment as to Counts I-VI filed by Plaintiff Saint Louis University. (Hoy, Bridget)
October 21, 2008 Filing 66 RESPONSE to Motion re 55 MOTION for Summary Judgment AS TO COUNTS I-VI OF THE COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Saint Louis University. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Meyer Depo (Part 1), # 2 Exhibit 1 - Meyer Depo (Part 2), # 3 Exhibit 2 - Article, # 4 Exhibit 3 - Hoy Affidavit, # 5 Exhibit 4 - Def Supp Answers to Interrogatories, # 6 Exhibit 5 - Def Response to Pltf First Request for Admission, # 7 Exhibit 6 - Benanti Depo (Part 1), # 8 Exhibit 6 - Benanti Depo (Part 2), # 9 Exhibit 7 - 6-22-07 Letter, # 10 Exhibit 8 - 8-16-07 Letter, # 11 Exhibit 9 - Galli Affidavit, # 12 Exhibit 10 - Weixlmann Affidavit, # 13 Exhibit 11 - Porterfield Affidavit)(Hoy, Bridget)
October 21, 2008 Filing 65 RESPONSE to Motion re 57 MOTION for Summary Judgment AS TO NO MONETARY DAMAGES DUE IN FAVOR OF PLAINTIFF Response to Defendant's Statement of Uncontroverted Facts Regarding Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment as to Monetary Damages filed by Plaintiff Saint Louis University. (Hoy, Bridget)
October 21, 2008 Filing 64 RESPONSE in Opposition re 57 MOTION for Summary Judgment AS TO NO MONETARY DAMAGES DUE IN FAVOR OF PLAINTIFF filed by Plaintiff Saint Louis University. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Pltf Ans to Def First Interrogatories, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Affidavit of Bridget Hoy, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Affidavit of Joe Weixlmann, # 4 Exhibit 4 - Affidavit of Louis Galli, Jr., # 5 Exhibit 5 - Meyer Depo (Part 1), # 6 Exhibit 5 - Meyer Depo (Part 2), # 7 Exhibit 6 - Def Response to Pltf First Req for Admission, # 8 Exhibit 7 - Def Supp Answers to Pltf First Interrogatories)(Hoy, Bridget)
October 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties' joint motion for extension of time 62 is granted. Plaintiff's responses to defendant's summary judgment motions shall be filed no later than October 21, 2008; defendants replies shall be filed no later than October 31, 2008. ( Response to Court due by 10/21/2008.). Signed by Honorable Carol E. Jackson on 10/14/08. (KKS)
October 10, 2008 Filing 62 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 57 MOTION for Summary Judgment AS TO NO MONETARY DAMAGES DUE IN FAVOR OF PLAINTIFF, 55 MOTION for Summary Judgment AS TO COUNTS I-VI OF THE COMPLAINT by Plaintiff Saint Louis University, Defendant Avis Meyer. (Hoy, Bridget)
September 18, 2008 Filing 61 REPLY to Response to Motion re 36 MOTION for Sanctions against Defendant Avis Meyer for Spoliation of Evidence filed by Plaintiff Saint Louis University. (Janoski, Frank)
September 16, 2008 Filing 60 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 36 MOTION for Sanctions against Defendant Avis Meyer for Spoliation of Evidence DEFENDANT'S MEMORANDUM IN REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S MEMORANDUM REGARDING SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY (D/E 51) filed by Defendant Avis Meyer. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-B)(Gill, Brian)
September 16, 2008 Filing 59 Order: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendants motion to strike plaintiffs memorandum of supplemental authority [Doc. #52] is denied. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendant is granted leave to file his response (attached as Exhibit 1 to Doc. # 52) to plaintiffs memorandum. ORDER denying 52 Motion to Strike Signed by Honorable Carol E. Jackson on 9/16/08. (KMH)
September 12, 2008 Filing 58 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re 57 MOTION for Summary Judgment AS TO NO MONETARY DAMAGES DUE IN FAVOR OF PLAINTIFF filed by Defendant Avis Meyer. (Nolte, Nelson) (KXS).
September 12, 2008 Filing 57 MOTION for Summary Judgment AS TO NO MONETARY DAMAGES DUE IN FAVOR OF PLAINTIFF by Defendant Avis Meyer. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Nolte, Nelson)
September 12, 2008 Filing 56 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re 55 MOTION for Summary Judgment AS TO COUNTS I-VI OF THE COMPLAINT filed by Defendant Avis Meyer. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-2, # 2 Exhibit 3-4)(Gill, Brian)
September 12, 2008 Filing 55 MOTION for Summary Judgment AS TO COUNTS I-VI OF THE COMPLAINT by Defendant Avis Meyer. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Statement of Facts)(Gill, Brian)
September 3, 2008 Filing 54 Order IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties joint motion for extension of time to file dispositive motions [Doc. #50] is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that dispositive motions shall be filed no later than September 12, 2008; responses in opposition shall be filed no later than October 14, 2008; replies in support shall be filed no later than October 24, 2008. ORDER granting 50 Motion to Amend/Correct Dispositive Motions due by 9/12/2008. Signed by Honorable Carol E. Jackson on 9/3/08. (KMH)
September 3, 2008 Filing 53 RESPONSE in Opposition re 52 MOTION to Strike 51 Memorandum in Support of Motion, AND ALTERNATIVELY DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S MEMORANDUM (D/E 51) MOTION to Strike 51 Memorandum in Support of Motion, AND ALTERNATIVELY DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S MEMORANDUM (D/E 51) filed by Plaintiff Saint Louis University. (Hoy, Bridget)
August 29, 2008 Filing 52 MOTION to Strike 51 Memorandum in Support of Motion, AND ALTERNATIVELY DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S MEMORANDUM (D/E 51) by Defendant Avis Meyer. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Gill, Brian)
August 27, 2008 Filing 51 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re 36 MOTION for Sanctions against Defendant Avis Meyer for Spoliation of Evidence Regarding Supplemental Authority Applicable to Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions for Spoliation of Evidence filed by Plaintiff Saint Louis University. (Hoy, Bridget)
August 27, 2008 Filing 50 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 12 Case Management Order, JOINT MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS by Defendant Avis Meyer. (Gill, Brian)
August 26, 2008 Filing 49 AFFIDAVIT re 35 Memorandum in Support of Motion Regarding Itemization of Fees and Costs Concerning Motion to Compel Full and Complete Interrogatory Answers by Plaintiff Saint Louis University. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Summary of Fees and Costs)(Janoski, Frank)
August 20, 2008 Filing 48 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Honorable Carol E. Jackson: Motion Hearing held on 8/20/2008 re 32 MOTION to Compel Discovery from Defendant Based Upon Waiver of Attorney-Client Privilege filed by Saint Louis University, 36 MOTION for Sanctions against Defendant Avis Meyer for Spoliation of Evidence filed by Saint Louis University, 34 MOTION to Compel Full and Complete Interrogatory Answers from Defendant Avis Meyer filed by Saint Louis University; arguments heard; the Court grants pltf's motion to compel #34; deft given 15 days to file supplemental answers to interrogatories; pltf's motion to compel as to attorney-client privilege #32 is denied; pltf's motion for sanctions #36 taken under submission. (Court Reporter or FTR Gold Operator initials:Gary Bond.) (KXS)
August 14, 2008 Filing 47 ADR COMPLIANCE REPORT by Neutral: Richard Sher Date of Conference: 8/8/08 participated in good faith: Yes, the parties DID NOT achieve a settlement(KXS)
August 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall appear for a hearing on plaintiff's motions to compel and for sanctions at 2:30 p.m. on Wednesday, August 20, 2008. The defendant and a representative of the plaintiff are required to attend the hearing. Signed by Honorable Carol E. Jackson on 8/11/08. (KXS)
July 28, 2008 Filing 45 REPLY to Response to Motion re 36 MOTION for Sanctions against Defendant Avis Meyer for Spoliation of Evidence filed by Plaintiff Saint Louis University. (Janoski, Frank)
July 28, 2008 Filing 44 REPLY to Response to Motion re 34 MOTION to Compel Full and Complete Interrogatory Answers from Defendant Avis Meyer filed by Plaintiff Saint Louis University. (Janoski, Frank)
July 28, 2008 Filing 43 REPLY to Response to Motion re 32 MOTION to Compel Discovery from Defendant Based Upon Waiver of Attorney-Client Privilege filed by Plaintiff Saint Louis University. (Janoski, Frank)
July 23, 2008 Filing 42 RESPONSE in Opposition re 36 MOTION for Sanctions against Defendant Avis Meyer for Spoliation of Evidence filed by Defendant Avis Meyer. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit A1, # 3 Exhibit A2, # 4 Exhibit B)(Gill, Brian)
July 23, 2008 Filing 41 RESPONSE in Opposition re 32 MOTION to Compel Discovery from Defendant Based Upon Waiver of Attorney-Client Privilege filed by Defendant Avis Meyer. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit A1, # 3 Exhibit A2)(Gill, Brian)
July 23, 2008 Filing 40 RESPONSE in Opposition re 34 MOTION to Compel Full and Complete Interrogatory Answers from Defendant Avis Meyer filed by Defendant Avis Meyer. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit B1, # 4 Exhibit B2, # 5 Exhibit C)(Gill, Brian)
July 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting 38 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Signed by Honorable Carol E. Jackson on 07/11/2008. (CEJ)
July 10, 2008 Filing 38 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 32 MOTION to Compel Discovery from Defendant Based Upon Waiver of Attorney-Client Privilege, 36 MOTION for Sanctions against Defendant Avis Meyer for Spoliation of Evidence, 34 MOTION to Compel Full and Complete Interrogatory Answers from Defendant Avis Meyer by Defendant Avis Meyer. (Gill, Brian)
July 8, 2008 Filing 37 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re 36 MOTION for Sanctions against Defendant Avis Meyer for Spoliation of Evidence filed by Plaintiff Saint Louis University. (Janoski, Frank)
July 8, 2008 Filing 36 MOTION for Sanctions against Defendant Avis Meyer for Spoliation of Evidence by Plaintiff Saint Louis University. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Part 1, # 3 Exhibit 2 - Part 2, # 4 Exhibit 2 - Part 3, # 5 Exhibit 2 - Part 4, # 6 Exhibit 2 - Part 5, # 7 Exhibit 3, # 8 Exhibit 4)(Janoski, Frank)
July 8, 2008 Filing 35 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re 34 MOTION to Compel Full and Complete Interrogatory Answers from Defendant Avis Meyer filed by Plaintiff Saint Louis University. (Janoski, Frank)
July 8, 2008 Filing 34 MOTION to Compel Full and Complete Interrogatory Answers from Defendant Avis Meyer by Plaintiff Saint Louis University. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Part 1, # 3 Exhibit 2 - Part 2, # 4 Exhibit 2 - Part 3, # 5 Exhibit 2 - Part 4, # 6 Exhibit 2 - Part 5, # 7 Exhibit 3)(Janoski, Frank)
July 8, 2008 Filing 33 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re 32 MOTION to Compel Discovery from Defendant Based Upon Waiver of Attorney-Client Privilege filed by Plaintiff Saint Louis University. (Janoski, Frank)
July 8, 2008 Filing 32 MOTION to Compel Discovery from Defendant Based Upon Waiver of Attorney-Client Privilege by Plaintiff Saint Louis University. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Part 1, # 4 Exhibit 3 - Part 2, # 5 Exhibit 3 - Part 3, # 6 Exhibit 3 - Part 4, # 7 Exhibit 3 - Part 5, # 8 Exhibit 4)(Janoski, Frank)
June 30, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting 29 Motion for Extension ; granting 30 Motion for Extension Signed by Honorable Carol E. Jackson on 06/30/2008. (CEJ)
June 27, 2008 Filing 30 Joint MOTION for Extension of: ADR Referral Period by Plaintiff Saint Louis University. (Janoski, Frank)
June 27, 2008 Filing 29 MOTION for Extension of: Time to File Discovery Motions by Plaintiff Saint Louis University. (Janoski, Frank)
June 12, 2008 Filing 28 DESIGNATION of Neutral by Clerk of Court Neutral designated: Richard Sher(KXS) (Copy mailed to Richard Sher)
June 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendant's motion for a courtdesignated neutral mediator [Doc. #20] is granted in part and denied in part. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall appoint Richard P. Sher, Devereaux Murphy LLC, as the neutral to conduct mediation in this matter. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the deadline to complete mediation is extended to August 1, 2008. 20 Signed by Honorable Carol E. Jackson on 6/12/08. (KXS)
June 11, 2008 Filing 26 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Honorable Carol E. Jackson: Motion Hearing held on 6/11/2008 re 20 Defendant's motion; Court held discussion with counsel; Court GRANTED defendant's motion and appointed Richard Sher as neutral; Court GRANTED plaintiffs oral request to extend the ADR completion deadline to August 1, 2008; Court GRANTED oral motion for extension of time to file discovery.(Court Reporter or FTR Gold Operator initials:Gary Bond.) (FTR Gold yes or no: No.) (KMH)
June 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this matter is set for a hearing on the parties' designation of neutral on Wednesday, June 11, 2008, at 1:30 p.m. in the courtroom of the undersigned; Signed by Honorable Carol E. Jackson on 06/04/2008;(DJO)
June 3, 2008 Filing 24 Designation of Neutral by parties and ADR Conference Report by Plaintiff Saint Louis University (Janoski, Frank)
June 3, 2008 Filing 23 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 20 MOTION for Leave to Opposition to Motion for Court Designated Neutral Mediator, Cross Motion for Designation of Richard P. Sher and Request for Conference Regarding Same filed by Plaintiff Saint Louis University. (Janoski, Frank)
May 27, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting 21 Motion for Extension of Time to File Signed by Honorable Carol E. Jackson on 05/27/2008. (CEJ)
May 21, 2008 Filing 21 MOTION for Extension of Time to File ;Extension to file the following: Designation of Neutral by Parties and ADR Conference Report ;Proposed extension date June 3, 2008 by Plaintiff Saint Louis University. (Janoski, Frank)
May 21, 2008 Filing 20 MOTION for a court designated neutral mediation filed by Defendant Avis Meyer Neutral: Ms. Annette P. Heller (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Gill, Brian) Modified on 5/22/2008 (KXS).
May 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Alternative Dispute Resolution. This case is referred to: mediation. Designation of Lead Counsel: Frank Janoski. ADR Conference Schedule due by 5/21/2008. Designation of Neutral due by 5/21/2008. ADR Completion Deadline due by 7/1/2008. Signed by Honorable Carol E. Jackson on 5/5/08. (KXS)
April 11, 2008 Filing 18 PROTECTIVE ORDER 17 . Signed by Honorable Carol E. Jackson on 4/11/08. (KKS)
April 10, 2008 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for protective order 14 is granted in part and denied in part. An order governing the parties' handling of confidential material will be entered separately.. Signed by Honorable Carol E. Jackson on 4/10/08. (KKS)
April 8, 2008 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re 14 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Plaintiff Saint Louis University. (Janoski, Frank)
April 4, 2008 Filing 15 RESPONSE to Motion re 14 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Defendant Avis Meyer. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Gill, Brian)
March 27, 2008 Filing 14 MOTION for Protective Order by Plaintiff Saint Louis University. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Janoski, Frank)
February 28, 2008 Filing 13 ENTRY of Appearance by Brian J. Gill for Defendant Avis Meyer. (Gill, Brian)
February 7, 2008 Filing 12 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER This case is assigned to Track: 2 Standard Motion to Join Parties due by 3/31/2008. ADR Future Reference 5/1/2008. Discovery Completion due by 8/18/2008. Dispositive Motions due by 8/29/2008. Pretrial Compliance due by 12/31/2008. Motion in Limine due by 1/10/2009. Bench Trial set for 1/20/2009 09:30 AM before Honorable Carol E. Jackson. Signed by Honorable Carol E. Jackson on 2/7/08. (KCM)
February 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER -- IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall submit complete transcripts of all deposition testimony that is cited in support of or in opposition to a motion. Excerpted portions of a witness's deposition testimony will not be considered by the Court absent a showing of good cause for not submitting the entire transcript. Signed by Honorable Carol E. Jackson on 2/7/08. (KCM)
January 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Rule 16 Conference reset for 2/7/2008 10:30 AM in Chambers before Honorable Carol E. Jackson. Signed by Honorable Carol E. Jackson on 1/22/08. (KXS)
January 10, 2008 Filing 9 JOINT SCHEDULING PLAN by Plaintiff Saint Louis University.. (Hoy, Bridget)
December 14, 2007 Filing 8 RULE 16 ORDER This case is assigned to Track: 2. Joint Scheduling Plan due by 1/14/2008. Rule 16 Conference set for 1/24/2008 09:30 AM in In Chambers before Honorable Carol E. Jackson. Signed by Honorable Carol E. Jackson on 12/14/07. (KXS)
December 10, 2007 Filing 7 DEFENDANT'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE-- ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by Avis Meyer.(Nolte, Nelson)
December 10, 2007 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Nelson D. Nolte for Defendant Avis Meyer. (Nolte, Nelson)
December 10, 2007 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Scott A. Smith for Defendant Avis Meyer. (Smith, Scott)
November 6, 2007 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Saint Louis University Avis Meyer waiver sent on 10/11/2007, answer due 12/10/2007. (Janoski, Frank)
November 2, 2007 Filing 3 CJRA ORDER (jgw): IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the above styled case is randomly reassigned from Magistrate Judge Audrey G. Fleissig to District Judge Carol E. Jackson. (TRC)
October 15, 2007 Filing 2 REPORT to Commissioner of filing or determination of an action regarding Trademark (CDD, )
October 11, 2007 Case Opening Notification - Waivers issued 1, Judge Assigned: Honorable Audrey G. Fleissig. (CDD, )
October 11, 2007 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Defendant Avis Meyer filed by Saint Louis University. Fee paid in the amount of $350.00, with receipt number 1233534. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Waiver of Service # 6 Original Filing Form # 7 Civil Cover Sheet # 8 Disclosure of Corporation Interests Certificate)(Hoy, Bridget) Modified on 10/15/2007 (CDD, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Saint Louis University v. Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Saint Louis University
Represented By: Frank B. Janoski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avis Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?